Estate Michaelangelo Jackson, et al v. Richard Billingslea, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF DETROIT, MI, RICHARD BILLINGSLEA, in his individual and official capacities, HAKEEM PATTERSON, in his individual and official capacities and STEVEN FULTZ, in his individual and official capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: LAKENDRA GARDNER, ESTATE OF MAKIAH JACKSON, ESTATE OF MICHAELANGELO JACKSON, ALISHA JACKSON, in her capacity as the Personal Representative of the Estates of Michaelangelo Jackson and Makiah Jackson, I. W., through his next of friend Keira Andrews, Z. G., through his next of friend Denise LaSalle Gardner and D. A., through his next of friend Tiffany Hill
Case Number: 19-1962
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:20 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/21/2019. appellee brief now due 12/23/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 09/19/2019 02:50 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 REGARDING MEDIATION: The Telephone Mediation Conference scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg will ONLY INCLUDE CA No. 19-1962. [19-1962, 19-2034] (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2019 02:33 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg will include BOTH CA Nos. 19-1962 and 19-2034. [Please open amended notice for important details and deadlines.] [19-1962, 19-2034] (LMR) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:31 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg will include in BOTH CA Nos. 19-1962 AND 19-2034. [Please open amended notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:25 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Solomon M. Radner for D. A., Estate of Makiah Jackson, Estate of Michaelangelo Jackson, Z. G., Lakendra Gardner, Alisha Jackson and I. W.. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1962] (SMR) [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:04 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Solomon M. Radner for Appellants D. A., Estate of Makiah Jackson, Estate of Michaelangelo Jackson, Z. G., Lakendra Gardner, Alisha Jackson and I. W.. Certificate of Service:09/11/2019. [19-1962] (SMR) [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:03 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Solomon M. Radner for Appellants D. A., Estate of Makiah Jackson, Estate of Michaelangelo Jackson, Z. G., Lakendra Gardner, Alisha Jackson and I. W. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1962] (SMR) [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:01 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants D. A., Estate of Makiah Jackson, Estate of Michaelangelo Jackson, Z. G., Lakendra Gardner, Alisha Jackson and I. W. by Solomon M. Radner. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1962] (SMR) [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:56 PM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Sheri L. Whyte for Appellees Richard Billingslea, City of Detroit, MI, Steven Fultz and Hakeem Patterson Certificate of Service: 09/05/2019. [19-1962] (SLW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:29 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Richard Billingslea, City of Detroit, MI, Steven Fultz and Hakeem Patterson by Sheri L. Whyte. Certificate of Service: 08/30/2019. [19-1962] (SLW) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:34 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:01 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:56 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/07/2019; appellee brief due 11/06/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:54 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:53 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants D. A., Estate of Makiah Jackson, Estate of Michaelangelo Jackson, Z. G., Lakendra Gardner, Alisha Jackson and I. W.. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Estate Michaelangelo Jackson, et al v. Richard Billingslea, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF DETROIT, MI
Represented By: Michael M. Muller
Represented By: Sheri L. Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD BILLINGSLEA, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Michael M. Muller
Represented By: Sheri L. Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAKEEM PATTERSON, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Michael M. Muller
Represented By: Sheri L. Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN FULTZ, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Michael M. Muller
Represented By: Sheri L. Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAKENDRA GARDNER
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF MAKIAH JACKSON
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF MICHAELANGELO JACKSON
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALISHA JACKSON, in her capacity as the Personal Representative of the Estates of Michaelangelo Jackson and Makiah Jackson
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: I. W., through his next of friend Keira Andrews
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Z. G., through his next of friend Denise LaSalle Gardner
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: D. A., through his next of friend Tiffany Hill
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?