Christopher Ogden v. Little Caesar Enterprises, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LC TRADEMARKS, INC. and LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER OGDEN
Case Number: 19-1986
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/18/2019. appellee brief now due 12/17/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:31 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Emily E. Hughes. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2019. [19-1986] (EH) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:36 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Mahde Y. Abdallah. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2019. [19-1986] (MYA) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:28 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Leigh M. Perica. Certificate of Service: 09/17/2019. [19-1986] (LMP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 02:02 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Derek Y. Brandt. Certificate of Service: 09/17/2019. [19-1986] (DYB) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:59 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Robert L. Zisk. Certificate of Service: 09/17/2019. [19-1986] (RLZ) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:12 AM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/28/2019; appellee brief due 11/26/2019. (REO) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:21 AM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. E. Powell Miller for Christopher Ogden. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2019. [19-1986] (EPM) [Entered: 09/16/2019 05:11 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Adam M. Wenner. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2019. [19-1986] (AMW) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:23 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Michelle E. Conston. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2019. [19-1986] (MC) [Entered: 09/16/2019 02:43 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Sharon Sue Almonrode for Appellant Christopher Ogden Certificate of Service: 09/13/2019. [19-1986] (SSA) [Entered: 09/13/2019 01:00 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sharon Sue Almonrode for Appellant Christopher Ogden. Certificate of Service:09/13/2019. [19-1986] (SSA) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:59 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Lee Sturm for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1986] (MLS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:30 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 10/04/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:38 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by J. Michael Huget. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-1986] (JMH) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:17 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Michael L. Sturm. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-1986] (MLS) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:33 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Walter W. Noss. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1986] (WWN) [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:42 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by Sharon S. Almonrode. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1986] (SSA) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:15 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Christopher Ogden by E. Powell Miller. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1986] (EPM) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:03 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/26/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:51 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:39 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 08/30/2019 09:10 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Christopher Ogden. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 08/30/2019 08:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Ogden v. Little Caesar Enterprises, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LC TRADEMARKS, INC.
Represented By: John Michael Huget
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Represented By: Michael Lee Sturm
Represented By: Robert Louis Zisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: John Michael Huget
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Represented By: Michael Lee Sturm
Represented By: Robert Louis Zisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER OGDEN
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Michelle Conston
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Mahde Youssef Abdallah
Represented By: Leigh Michele Perica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?