Lemuel Brown v. Jeffrey Woods, et al
Defendant / Appellee: [UNKNOWN] FILION, RICHARD D. RUSSELL, Manager Grievance Section, Office of Legal Affairs, [UNKNOWN] LAPLANT, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] SMITH, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] WARNER, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER C. HELMS, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] GARLINGHOUSE, DANIEL H. HEYNS, Director of the Michigan Department of Corrections, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] PIERCE, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] GOLLADAY, [UNKNOWN] MILLETTE, JEFFREY WOODS, Warden, GARY W. MCLEOD, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] KOBEN, CONNIE HORTON, Warden, [UNKNOWN] SURIANO, [UNKNOWN] WINNICKI, [UNKNOWN] DUNTON, R. GRAHAM, PAUL KLEE, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GARY E. KOBEN, PENNY FILION, GARY SURIANO, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER CHRISTOPHER GOLLADAY, AMANDA WINNICKI and MICHAEL P. MILLETTE
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEMUEL D. BROWN
Case Number: 19-2004
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/16/2019;. (RGF) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:21 AM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Copy of District Court Order filed granting in forma pauperis filed November 1, 2019. (RGF) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:21 AM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. 10/21/2019 view26 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account and a Six Month Trust Account Statement submitted by plaintiff Lemuel D. Brown #192709 to cure deficiency (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Financial Documents) (slk) (RGF) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:20 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant MOTION filed by Lemuel D. Brown to proceed in forma pauperis . Certificate of service: 10/04/2019. (RGF) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:28 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Miscellaneous letter sent to Mr. Brown, motion to proceed for ifp status and prisoner trust account must be filed in District Court first. (RGF) [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:01 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (RGF) [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:12 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Appellant MOTION filed by Lemuel D. Brown to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 09/26/2019. (RGF) [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:11 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant MOTION filed by Lemuel D. Brown for appointment of counsel. Certificate of service: 09/26/2019. (RGF) [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:59 AM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to either pay fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the DISTRICT COURT. (RGF) [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:16 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Deficiency notice filed. (RGF) [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:14 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (RGF) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:32 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:32 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Lemuel D. Brown. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lemuel Brown v. Jeffrey Woods, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: [UNKNOWN] FILION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD D. RUSSELL, Manager Grievance Section, Office of Legal Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: [UNKNOWN] LAPLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER C. HELMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] GARLINGHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL H. HEYNS, Director of the Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] GOLLADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: [UNKNOWN] MILLETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY WOODS, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY W. MCLEOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER [UNKNOWN] KOBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONNIE HORTON, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: [UNKNOWN] SURIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: [UNKNOWN] WINNICKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: [UNKNOWN] DUNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL KLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER GARY E. KOBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENNY FILION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY SURIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER CHRISTOPHER GOLLADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA WINNICKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL P. MILLETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEMUEL D. BROWN
Represented By: Lemuel D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?