Little Traverse Bay Bands v. Gretchen Whitmer, et al
Intervenor / Appellee: TOWNSHIP OF CENTER, EMMET COUNTY, MI, CITY OF CHARLEVOIX, TOWNSHIP OF PLEASANTVIEW, TOWNSHIP OF CROSS VILLAGE, CITY OF HARBOR SPRINGS, TOWNSHIP OF RESORT, EMMET COUNTY LAKE SHORE ASSOCIATION, THE PROTECTION OF RIGHTS ALLIANCE, TOWNSHIP OF FRIENDSHIP, CITY OF PETOSKEY, TOWNSHIP OF WEST TRAVERSE, TOWNSHIP OF BEAR CREEK, TOWNSHIP OF CHARLEVOIX, CHARLEVOIX COUNTY, MI, TOWNSHIP OF BLISS, TOWNSHIP OF READMOND, TOWNSHIP OF LITTLE TRAVERSE and CITY OF CHARLEVOIX, MI
Defendant / Appellee: GRETCHEN WHITMER, Governor of the State of Michigan
Plaintiff / Appellant: LITTLE TRAVERSE BAY BANDS OF ODAWA INDIANS
Not Yet Classified: CITY OF PETOSKEY, MI and CITY OF HARBOR SPRINGS, MI
Case Number: 19-2070
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 43 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. [19-2070, 19-2107] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:02 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 42 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/28/2019 is hereby canceled. [19-2070, 19-2107] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:47 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 41 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [32] Transcript to be filed in district court by Kathleen Sue Thomas by 11/21/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 10/23/2019 07:10 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 40 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2107, 19-2070, for transcript [6264969-2] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 10/22/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 11/22/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 345 pages . [19-2107, 19-2070] (KST) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:15 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 39 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [32] , relating to transcript order, [6264969-2] Transcript to be filed in district court by Kathleen Sue Thomas by 11/18/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 10/17/2019 07:14 AM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 38 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2070, 19-2107, for transcript [6264969-2] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 10/16/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 11/16/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 300 pages . [19-2070, 19-2107] (KST) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:50 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 37 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellees Cross-Appellants Charlevoix County, MI, City of Harbor Springs, MI, City of Petoskey, MI and Emmet County, MI in 19-2107, Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellees Cross-Appellants City of Petoskey, MI, City of Harbor Springs, MI, Emmet County, MI and Charlevoix County, MI in 19-2070. Certificate of Service:10/10/2019. [19-2107, 19-2070] (JCG) [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:07 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Giampetroni for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070 Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2107, 19-2070] (DAG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:11 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2107, 19-2070 by David A. Giampetroni. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2107, 19-2070] (DAG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:10 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2107, 19-2070 by Riyaz A. Kanji. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2107, 19-2070] (RAK) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:07 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 33 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [32]. Kathleen Sue Thomas's acknowledgement is due 10/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:52 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas in 19-2070, 19-2107, filed by Mr. David A. Giampetroni for Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070. [32] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 10/02/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Hon. Paul L. Maloney ; Hearing Dates: June 24, 2019 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment ; and June 25, 2019 Continued Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (DAG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:55 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Giampetroni for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070. Certificate of Service:10/02/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (DAG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:39 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Giampetroni for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070 Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (DAG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:37 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 29 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070, 19-2107 by David A. Giampetroni. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (DAG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:12 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Riyaz A. Kanji. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (RAK) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:10 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 10/28/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [19-2070, 19-2107] (LMR) [Entered: 10/02/2019 11:37 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellees Cross-Appellants Charlevoix County, MI, City of Harbor Springs, MI, City of Petoskey, MI and Emmet County, MI in 19-2070, Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellees Cross-Appellants City of Petoskey, MI, City of Harbor Springs, MI, Emmet County, MI and Charlevoix County, MI in 19-2107 Certificate of Service: 10/02/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (JCG) [Entered: 10/02/2019 08:13 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians in 19-2070, 19-2107 by James A. Bransky. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (JAB) [Entered: 10/01/2019 08:19 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Scott W. Howard for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 05:10 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Appearance of Scott W. Howard on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:41 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, 19-2107 by Appearance of William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (WR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:38 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 ***ENTRY LOCKED - EACH COUNSEL MUST FILE THEIR OWN APPEARANCE FORMS UNDER THEIR OWN PACER ACCOUNTS.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Township of Charlevoix and City of Charlevoix, MI in 19-2070, Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2107 by Appearances of Scott W. Howard and William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by KSF] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:33 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 19 ],, appearance form , [ # 18 ], filed by Mr. Scott W. Howard and Mr. William Rastetter for City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2107 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 10/08/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107] (KSF) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:21 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL MUST REFILE THE APPEARANCE FORM USING HIS OWN PACER ACCOUNT AND UNCHECK THE BOX FOR THE CROSS APPEAL OR INCLUDE BOTH CASE NUMBERS ON THE APPEARANCE FORM.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070 by Appearance of William Rastetter on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by KSF] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:44 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL MUST REFILE APPEARANCE FORM AND UNCHECK THE BOX FOR THE CROSS APPEAL OR INCLUDE BOTH CASE NUMBERS ON THE APPEARANCE FORM.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Township of Charlevoix in 19-2070, Appellees City of Charlevoix, MI and Township of Charlevoix in 19-2107 by Appearance of Scott W. Howard on behalf of the City of Charlevoix and Charlevoix Township. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070, 19-2107]--[Edited 10/01/2019 by KSF] (SWH) [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:42 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thaddeus E. Morgan for Appellees Township of Bear Creek, Township of Bliss, Township of Center, Township of Cross Village, Township of Friendship, Township of Little Traverse, Township of Pleasantview, Township of Readmond, Township of Resort and Township of West Traverse Certificate of Service: 10/01/2019. [19-2070] (TEM) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:06 AM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled with Rod McFaull will include BOTH CA Nos. 19-2070 and 19-2107. [19-2107, 19-2070] (LMR) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:52 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Emmet County Lake Shore Association and The Protection of Rights Alliance by R. Lance Boldrey. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2019. [19-2070] (RLB) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:14 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Township of Bear Creek, Township of Bliss, Township of Center, Township of Cross Village, Township of Friendship, Township of Little Traverse, Township of Pleasantview, Township of Readmond, Township of Resort and Township of West Traverse by Ryan K. Kauffman. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2019. [19-2070] (RKK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 04:30 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Township of Bear Creek, Township of Bliss, Township of Center, Township of Cross Village, Township of Friendship, Township of Little Traverse, Township of Pleasantview, Township of Readmond, Township of Resort and Township of West Traverse by Thaddeus E. Morgan. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2019. [19-2070] (TEM) [Entered: 09/23/2019 04:24 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Gretchen Whitmer by Laura R. LaMore. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2019. [19-2070] (LRL) [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:52 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Gretchen Whitmer by Kelly M. Drake. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2019. [19-2070] (KMD) [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:13 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Update fee status change to paid. (KSF) [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:09 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Emmet County Lake Shore Association and The Protection of Rights Alliance by Erin A. Sedmak. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2019. [19-2070] (ES) [Entered: 09/20/2019 09:50 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Jill Margaret Wheaton for Appellees Emmet County Lake Shore Association and The Protection of Rights Alliance Certificate of Service: 09/19/2019. [19-2070] (JMW) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:31 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Emmet County Lake Shore Association and The Protection of Rights Alliance by Jill M. Wheaton. Certificate of Service: 09/19/2019. [19-2070] (JMW) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:11 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Gretchen Whitmer by Jaclyn Shoshana Levine. Certificate of Service: 09/19/2019. [19-2070] (JSL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 02:12 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:37 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:33 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Charlevoix County, MI, City of Petoskey, City of Harbor Springs and Emmet County, MI by Jeffrey C. Gerish. Certificate of Service: 09/18/2019. [19-2070] (JCG) [Entered: 09/18/2019 03:55 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 09/18/2019 03:01 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Little Traverse Bay Bands of Odawa Indians. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Traverse Bay Bands v. Gretchen Whitmer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF CENTER
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: EMMET COUNTY, MI
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CITY OF CHARLEVOIX
Represented By: William Rastetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF PLEASANTVIEW
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF CROSS VILLAGE
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CITY OF HARBOR SPRINGS
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF RESORT
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: EMMET COUNTY LAKE SHORE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Erin Sedmak
Represented By: Jill Margaret Wheaton
Represented By: R. Lance Boldrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: THE PROTECTION OF RIGHTS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Erin Sedmak
Represented By: Jill Margaret Wheaton
Represented By: R. Lance Boldrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF FRIENDSHIP
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CITY OF PETOSKEY
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF WEST TRAVERSE
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF BEAR CREEK
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF CHARLEVOIX
Represented By: William Rastetter
Represented By: Scott W. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CHARLEVOIX COUNTY, MI
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF BLISS
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF READMOND
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: TOWNSHIP OF LITTLE TRAVERSE
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Represented By: Ryan K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CITY OF CHARLEVOIX, MI
Represented By: William Rastetter
Represented By: Scott W. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRETCHEN WHITMER, Governor of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Jaclyn Shoshana Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth Morrisseau
Represented By: Kelly M. Drake
Represented By: Laura Rose LaMore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LITTLE TRAVERSE BAY BANDS OF ODAWA INDIANS
Represented By: James Alan Bransky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CITY OF PETOSKEY, MI
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CITY OF HARBOR SPRINGS, MI
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?