Debra Taylor-David v. Guardian Loan Co of Massapequa, et al
Defendant / Appellee: GUARDIAN LOAN COMPANY OF MASSAPEQUA, INC., ORLANS, PC, CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON CSFM 2005-12, Trustee of U.S. Bank National Association and WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEBRA TAYLOR-DAVID, fka Debra Taylor
Case Number: 19-2129
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy Sabbota Gottlieb for Appellee Credit Suisse First Boston CSFM 2005-12. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-2129] --[Edited 10/11/2019 by AEG] (ASG) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:11 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Credit Suisse First Boston CSFM 2005-12 by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-2129] (ASG) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:11 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy Sabbota Gottlieb for Appellee Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-2129] --[Edited 10/11/2019 by AEG] (ASG) [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:23 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 *LOCKED*APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Wells Fargo Home Mortgage by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-2129] ***counsel re-filed*** --[Edited 10/11/2019 by AEG] (ASG) [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:22 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Regina Marie Slowey for Appellee Orlans, PC Certificate of Service: 10/10/2019. [19-2129] (RMS) [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:45 AM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Orlans, PC by Regina M. Slowey. Certificate of Service: 10/10/2019. [19-2129] (RMS) [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:40 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/14/2019;. appellee brief due 12/17/2019;. (JEC) [Entered: 10/02/2019 08:37 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 10/02/2019 08:35 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Debra Taylor-David. Transcript needed: n. (JEC) [Entered: 10/02/2019 08:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Debra Taylor-David v. Guardian Loan Co of Massapequa, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUARDIAN LOAN COMPANY OF MASSAPEQUA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORLANS, PC
Represented By: Regina Marie Slowey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON CSFM 2005-12, Trustee of U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBRA TAYLOR-DAVID, fka Debra Taylor
Represented By: Debra Taylor-David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?