Carl Morris v. Jack Kowalski
Respondent / Appellee: DUNCAN MACLAREN and JACK KOWALSKI
Petitioner / Appellant: CARL MORRIS
Case Number: 19-2132
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jack Kowalski by Andrea M. Christensen-Brown. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2019. [19-2132] (AMC) [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:09 AM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant MOTION filed by Carl Morris to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service:.none (CB) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:11 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER SENT to Carl Morris, regarding copies. (CB) [Entered: 11/13/2019 07:44 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORRESPONDENCE: Letter regarding copies by Carl Morris. (CB) [Entered: 11/13/2019 07:40 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:29 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Carl Morris. Transcript needed: n. (CB) [Entered: 10/02/2019 01:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carl Morris v. Jack Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DUNCAN MACLAREN
Represented By: John S. Pallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JACK KOWALSKI
Represented By: John S. Pallas
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CARL MORRIS
Represented By: Carl Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?