James Rice v. Warden, Warren Corr Inst
Petitioner / Appellant: JAMES RICE
Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN, WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Case Number: 19-3005
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 20, 2019 James Rice v. Warden

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING motion to extend time to file brief [ # 6 ] filed by Mr. Allen Mark Vender. Appellant brief now due 03/11/2019, appellee brief now due 04/09/2019. (AEG) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:40 AM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Mr. Allen Mark Vender for James Rice to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-3005] (AMV) [Entered: 02/20/2019 01:35 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/25/2019;. appellee brief due 03/26/2019. (AEG) [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:14 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant James Rice by Allen Vender. Certificate of Service: 01/15/2019. [19-3005] (AMV) [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:48 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Warden, Warren Correctional Institution by Maura O'Neill Jaite. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2019. [19-3005] (MOJ) [Entered: 01/03/2019 08:29 AM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (AEG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 03:25 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability granted. Notice filed by Appellant James Rice. Transcript needed: n. (AEG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 03:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Rice v. Warden, Warren Corr Inst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAMES RICE
Represented By: Allen Mark Vender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN, WARREN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?