KCI USA, Inc. v. Healthcare Essentials, Inc., et al

Defendant: HEALTHCARE ESSENTIALS, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: COLIN TENNEBAR
Plaintiff / Appellee: KCI USA, INC.
Case Number: 19-3006
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Mr. Orville Edward Stifel, II. Appellant brief now due 03/28/2019, appellee brief now due 04/29/2019. (AEG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:52 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION filed by Mr. Orville Edward Stifel, II for Colin Tennebar to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2019. [19-3006] (OES) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:44 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/26/2019; appellee brief due 03/28/2019. (AEG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:01 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Orville Edward Stifel, II for Colin Tennebar. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3006] (OES) [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:00 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Orville Edward Stifel, II for Appellant Colin Tennebar Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3006] (OES) [Entered: 01/16/2019 08:59 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Orville Edward Stifel, II for Appellant Colin Tennebar. Certificate of Service:01/16/2019. [19-3006] (OES) [Entered: 01/16/2019 08:58 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Colin Tennebar by Orville E. Stifel, II. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3006] (OES) [Entered: 01/16/2019 08:53 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee KCI USA, Inc. by David A. Landman. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3006] (DAL) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:13 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas O. Crist for Appellee KCI USA, Inc. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3006] (TOC) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:10 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee KCI USA, Inc. by Thomas O. Crist. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3006] (TOC) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:10 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (AEG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 05:08 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Colin Tennebar. Transcript needed: y. (AEG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 05:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KCI USA, Inc. v. Healthcare Essentials, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCARE ESSENTIALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COLIN TENNEBAR
Represented By: Orville Edward Stifel II
Represented By: John B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KCI USA, INC.
Represented By: David Aaron Landman
Represented By: Thomas O. Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?