Adrian Ayers v. Harold May
Respondent / Appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: ADRIAN AYERS
Case Number: 19-3465
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY filed by Adrian Ayers regarding response in opposition to the request for a certificate of appealability. Certificate of Service: 07/02/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/05/2019 02:30 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to proceed ifp, [ # 7 ]; previously filed by Adrian Ayers. Response from Attorney Ms. Maura O'Neill Jaite for Appellee Mr. Harold May Certificate of Service:06/06/2019. [19-3465] (MOJ) [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:29 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Adrian Ayers Certificate of Service: 05/26/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:04 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant MOTION filed by Adrian Ayers to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 05/26/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:03 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion grant certificate of appealability, [ # 5 ]; previously filed by Adrian Ayers. Response from Attorney Ms. Maura O'Neill Jaite for Appellee Mr. Harold May Certificate of Service:05/29/2019. [19-3465] (MOJ) [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:52 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Adrian Ayers to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 05/20/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:01 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Adrian Ayers Certificate of Service: 05/20/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:59 AM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mr. Harold May by Maura O'Neill Jaite. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2019. [19-3465] (MOJ) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:13 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:26 AM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Adrian Ayers. Transcript needed: n. (KSF) [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Adrian Ayers v. Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ADRIAN AYERS
Represented By: Adrian Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?