Helen Youngblood v. Bd of Comm of Mahoning Cnty, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ANTHONY TRAFICANTI, MAHONING COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES, ROBERT E. BUSH, JR., Director Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services, DAVID C. DITZLER, BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS OF MAHONING COUNTY, OHIO, CAROL RIMEDIO-RIGHETTI and MELISSA WASKO, Program Administrator Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: HELEN YOUNGBLOOD, Individually and as a putative class representative
Case Number: 19-3877
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 17, 2021 Helen Youngblood v. Bd. of Comm'rs of Mahoning Cnty.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 13 days [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Percy Squire. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/25/2019. Appellee brief now due 12/26/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:55 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION filed by Mr. Percy Squire for Helen Youngblood to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:19 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 ***LOCKED - AN ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE IS REQUIRED. COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE THE MOTION WITH AN ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE*** MOTION filed by Mr. Percy Squire for Helen Youngblood to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/11/2019. [19-3877]--[Edited 11/12/2019 by MMP] (PS) [Entered: 11/11/2019 01:44 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:31 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/12/2019; appellee brief due 12/11/2019 (MMP) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:48 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Percy Squire for Appellant Helen Youngblood Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:00 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Percy Squire for Appellant Helen Youngblood. Certificate of Service:09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:59 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Helen Youngblood by Percy Squire. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:58 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Board of Commissioners of Mahoning County, Ohio, Robert E. Bush, Jr., David C. Ditzler, Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services, Carol Rimedio-Righetti, Anthony Traficanti and Melissa Wasko by Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2019. [19-3877] (GDZ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 01:44 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 10/17/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:57 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ***LOCKED - THE APPEARANCE FORM IS BLANK. PLEASE COMPLETE THE FORM AND REFILE*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Board of Commissioners of Mahoning County, Ohio, Robert E. Bush, Jr., David C. Ditzler, Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services, Carol Rimedio-Righetti, Anthony Traficanti and Melissa Wasko by Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk. Certificate of Service: 09/19/2019. [19-3877]--[Edited 09/20/2019 by MMP] (GDZ) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:08 AM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/10/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:32 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:28 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:55 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Helen Youngblood. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Helen Youngblood v. Bd of Comm of Mahoning Cnty, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY TRAFICANTI
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAHONING COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT E. BUSH, JR., Director Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID C. DITZLER
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS OF MAHONING COUNTY, OHIO
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL RIMEDIO-RIGHETTI
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELISSA WASKO, Program Administrator Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services
Represented By: Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HELEN YOUNGBLOOD, Individually and as a putative class representative
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?