Jibriil Hersi v. Harold May
Petitioner / Appellant: JIBRIIL A. HERSI
Respondent / Appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Case Number: 19-3978
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. (MMD) [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:31 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION filed by Jibriil A. Hersi regarding change of address. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2019. (MMD) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:04 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mr. Harold May by Maura O'Neill Jaite. Certificate of Service: 10/25/2019. [19-3978] (MOJ) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:51 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Michelle Davis (MMD) [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:20 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with CAP unnecessary. Notice filed by Appellant Jibriil A. Hersi. Transcript needed: n. (MMD) [Entered: 10/10/2019 01:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jibriil Hersi v. Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JIBRIIL A. HERSI
Represented By: Jibriil A. Hersi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?