USA v. Jordan West

Defendant / Appellant: JORDAN WEST
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-5008
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. Pro Se appellant motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending, see RE # 15. (SSS) [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:58 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Appellant has until February 12, 2019 to either pay appellate filing fee to the district court or file a proper motion for pauper status and a financial affidavit with the district court. (SSS) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:48 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:20 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jordan West. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Jordan West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JORDAN WEST
Represented By: Jordan West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Barbara M. Zoccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?