Edward Burke v. Lawrence & Lawrence

Plaintiff / Appellant: EDWARD BURKE
Defendant / Appellee: LAWRENCE & LAWRENCE
Case Number: 19-5027
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 Letter sent by Mediation Office to hold briefing in abeyance pending mediation; all other deadlines remain in effect. A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 03/15/2019. [Please open letter for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:47 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Lawrence & Lawrence by Andrea R. Hunt. Certificate of Service: 02/14/2019. [19-5027] (ARH) [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:10 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 ****LOCKED**** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Lawrence & Lawrence by Andrea R. Hunt. Certificate of Service: 02/07/2019. [19-5027] COUNSEL kindly advised to refile appearance under her own PACER account. (JAC) [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:03 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Allan Cobb for Appellee Lawrence & Lawrence Certificate of Service: 01/28/2019. [19-5027] (JAC) [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:42 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Lawrence & Lawrence by Joseph Allan Cobb. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2019. [19-5027] (JAC) [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:41 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 03/05/2019; appellee brief due 04/04/2019 (PJE) [Entered: 01/24/2019 06:50 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Peter M. Gannott for Appellant Edward Burke. Certificate of Service:01/23/2019. [19-5027] (PMG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:06 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Peter M. Gannott for Appellant Edward Burke Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5027] (PMG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:04 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Edward Burke by Peter M. Gannott GANNOT LAW GROUP, PLLC 10230 Shelbyville Rd., Suite 6 Louisville, KY 40223 (502) 749-8800 pgannott@gannottlaw.com. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5027] (PMG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:03 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 02/14/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:56 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:02 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:54 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:58 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Edward Burke. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward Burke v. Lawrence & Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD BURKE
Represented By: Peter M. Gannott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWRENCE & LAWRENCE
Represented By: Andrea Renee Hunt
Represented By: Joseph Allan Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?