Leonel Martinez v. Randy White
Defendant: BILL HARVEY
Defendant / Appellee: RANDY L. WHITE, Warden
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEONEL MIRANDA MARTINEZ
Case Number: 19-5377
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. (CB) [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:18 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. (CB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:14 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 8 ], filed by Ms. Allison Rene Brown for Randy L. White is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (CAM) [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:39 PM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Randy L. White by Allison R. Brown. Certificate of Service: 05/02/2019. [19-5377] (ARB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:32 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Leonel Miranda Martinez. (CB) [Entered: 04/29/2019 08:10 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant MOTION filed by Leonel Miranda Martinez for appointment of counsel. Certificate of service: 04/10/2019. (CB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:09 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Leonel Miranda Martinez Certificate of Service: 04/10/2019. (CB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:07 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Copy of Copy of noa filed at Dist. Ct. filed. (CB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:06 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Update fee status change to due. (CB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:17 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:16 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Leonel Miranda Martinez. Transcript needed: n. (CB) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Leonel Martinez v. Randy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDY L. WHITE, Warden
Represented By: Allison Rene Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEONEL MIRANDA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Leonel Miranda Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?