Sharon Greer v. Anna Valentine
Petitioner / Appellant: SHARON DALE GREER
Respondent / Appellee: ANNA VALENTINE, Warden
Case Number: 19-5506
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Update fee status change to paid. Fee paid to District Court (received 06/06/2019) - $ 37.95, receipt number 5027757 . (SSS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:47 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORRESPONDENCE: Letter dated 06/26/2019 regarding the fee paid to District Court. by Mr. Sharon Dale Greer. (SSS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:43 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Appellant has 14 days to pay partial fee in the amount of $37.95 to the U.S. District Court by July 05, 2019 or request leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, a motion and an accompanying financial affidavit must be submitted to this court. (SSS) [Entered: 06/20/2019 11:13 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of District Court Order RE #30 filed 05/09/2019. MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Within 28 days, Greer must pay $37.95 to the Clerk in full satisfaction of the appellate filing fee. (SSS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:24 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:21 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Sharon Dale Greer. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharon Greer v. Anna Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SHARON DALE GREER
Represented By: Sharon Dale Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANNA VALENTINE, Warden
Represented By: Jason Bradley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?