EMW Women's Surgical Center, et al v. Adam Meier, et al
Defendant: THOMAS B. WINE
Plaintiff / Appellee: TANYA FRANKLIN, MD, , M.S.P.H., on behalf of herself and her patients, ASHLEE BERGIN, M.D., M.P.H., on behalf of herself and her patients and EMW WOMEN'S SURGICAL CENTER, P.S.C., on behalf of itself, its staff, and its patients
Defendant / Appellant: ADAM MEIER, in his official capacity as Secretary of Kentucky's Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Case Number: 19-5516
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Mark Stephen Pitt for Adam Meier. Certificate of Service:07/11/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-5516] (MSP) [Entered: 07/11/2019 01:13 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Mark Stephen Pitt for Adam Meier because Standard of Review is missing. Corrected brief due: 07/12/2019. (AEG) [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:59 PM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 *LOCKED*APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Mark Stephen Pitt for Adam Meier Certificate of Service:07/10/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-5516] ***Corrections requested*** --[Edited 07/11/2019 by AEG] (MSP) [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:43 PM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/10/2019; appellee brief due 08/09/2019. (AEG) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:30 AM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Matthew Franklin Kuhn for Adam Meier. Certificate of Service: 05/31/2019. [19-5516] (MFK) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:38 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Stephen Pitt for Appellant Adam Meier. Certificate of Service:05/29/2019. [19-5516] (MSP) [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:06 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Adam Meier by M. Stephen Pitt. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2019. [19-5516] (MSP) [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:37 AM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ashlee Bergin, EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C. and Tanya Franklin, MD by Meagan Burrows. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-5516] (MB) [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:00 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ashlee Bergin, EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C. and Tanya Franklin, MD by Elizabeth Watson. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-5516] (EW) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:56 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ashlee Bergin, EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C. and Tanya Franklin, MD by Andrew Beck. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-5516] (AB) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:54 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ashlee Bergin, EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C. and Tanya Franklin, MD by Alexa Kolbi-Molinas. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-5516] (AK) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:50 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Adam Meier by S. Chad Meredith. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2019. [19-5516] (SCM) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:12 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Adam Meier by Matthew F. Kuhn. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2019. [19-5516] (MFK) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:02 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ashlee Bergin, EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C. and Tanya Franklin, MD by Heather L. Gatnarek. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2019. [19-5516] (HLG) [Entered: 05/16/2019 09:32 AM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ashlee Bergin, EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C. and Tanya Franklin, MD by Amy D. Cubbage. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2019. [19-5516] (ADC) [Entered: 05/16/2019 09:15 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (AEG) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:28 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Adam Meier. Transcript needed: y. (AEG) [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMW Women's Surgical Center, et al v. Adam Meier, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TANYA FRANKLIN, MD, , M.S.P.H., on behalf of herself and her patients
Represented By: Andrew Beck
Represented By: Heather Lynn Gatnarek
Represented By: Amy D. Cubbage
Represented By: Elizabeth Watson
Represented By: Meagan Burrows
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ASHLEE BERGIN, M.D., M.P.H., on behalf of herself and her patients
Represented By: Andrew Beck
Represented By: Heather Lynn Gatnarek
Represented By: Amy D. Cubbage
Represented By: Elizabeth Watson
Represented By: Meagan Burrows
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMW WOMEN'S SURGICAL CENTER, P.S.C., on behalf of itself, its staff, and its patients
Represented By: Andrew Beck
Represented By: Heather Lynn Gatnarek
Represented By: Amy D. Cubbage
Represented By: Elizabeth Watson
Represented By: Meagan Burrows
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ADAM MEIER, in his official capacity as Secretary of Kentucky's Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: Mark Stephen Pitt
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS B. WINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?