Virgil Kelly v. Anna Valentine
Petitioner / Appellant: VIRGIL KELLY
Respondent / Appellee: ANNA VALENTINE, Warden
Case Number: 19-5620
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting motion to dismiss case due to the death of appellant Virgil Kelly [ # 5 ] filed by Mr. Gregory C. Fuchs. (JE) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:44 PM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Mr. Gregory C. Fuchs for Anna Valentine to dismiss the current action due to the death of Virgil Kelly on June 10, 2019. Certificate of Service: 07/03/2019. [19-5620] (GCF) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:24 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order filed 06/11/19 granting in forma pauperis. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/24/2019 08:08 AM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of District Court Order (RE #39) filed June 11, 2019, granting in forma pauperis. (RB) [Entered: 06/12/2019 10:16 AM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin Baker (RB) [Entered: 06/10/2019 12:53 PM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Virgil Kelly. Transcript needed: n. (RB) [Entered: 06/10/2019 12:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virgil Kelly v. Anna Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: VIRGIL KELLY
Represented By: Virgil Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANNA VALENTINE, Warden
Represented By: Gregory C. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?