Marion Kilburn v. Anna Valentine
Respondent / Appellee: ANNA VALENTINE, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: MARION KILBURN
Case Number: 19-5711
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 RULING LETTER SENT declaring as moot the motion to extend time to file a motion for a certificate of appealability [ # 8 ] filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:00 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn to extend time to file a motion for certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:56 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:54 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Marion Kilburn Certificate of Service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:53 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Marion Kilburn to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/16/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:52 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Appellant has until August 1, 2019 to either pay the filing fee to the District Court, or file IFP motion and affidavit in Sixth Circuit. (ASM) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:04 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of District Court Order filed 7/2/2019, R. 28 denying in forma pauperis.--[Edited 07/02/2019 by ASM] (ASM) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:49 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:43 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Marion Kilburn. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion Kilburn v. Anna Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANNA VALENTINE, Warden
Represented By: Kenneth W. Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MARION KILBURN
Represented By: Marion Kilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?