Quamine Jones v. Tony Mays
Petitioner / Appellant: QUAMINE JONES
Respondent / Appellee: TONY MAYS, Warden
Case Number: 19-5874
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of District Court Order filed denying a certificate of appealability and denying leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. (BLC) [Entered: 09/26/2019 11:13 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Quamine Jones. (BLC) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:34 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Quamine Jones to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 08/28/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:34 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Quamine Jones to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/28/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:32 AM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tony Mays by Thomas Austin Watkins. Certificate of Service: 08/13/2019. [19-5874] (TAW) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:13 AM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:11 AM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability pending in District Court. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Quamine Jones. Hearing held: n. (BLC) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Quamine Jones v. Tony Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: QUAMINE JONES
Represented By: Quamine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: TONY MAYS, Warden
Represented By: John H. Bledsoe
Represented By: Thomas Austin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?