In re: George Buford, III
Petitioner: In re: GEORGE W. BUFORD, III
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-6045
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file corrected second successive motion by 21 days [ # 6 ] filed by George W. Buford, III.. (MMP) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:46 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Movant MOTION filed by George W. Buford, III to extend time to file a corrected second successive habeas motion. Certificate of service: none (MMP) [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:21 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 FILED: brief in support of second or successive petition by George W. Buford, III. (per AH)--[Edited 09/17/2019 by MMP] (MMP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 03:01 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:35 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 RULING LETTER SENT directing Movant George W. Buford, III to file a corrected second successive habeas motion. (MMP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:21 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of District Court Order filed to transfer proceedings to Sixth Circuit (MMP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:19 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Second Successive Motion Docketed. Notice filed by Movant George W. Buford, III. 2nd/Successive Motion Received in 6CA: 07/29/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 12:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: George Buford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: GEORGE W. BUFORD, III
Represented By: George W. Buford III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Debra A. Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?