Debra Brusch v. USA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: VETERANS ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEBRA BRUSCH, Individual and Widow of Robert Terrance Brusch, deceased
Case Number: 19-6308
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 26, 2020 Debra Brusch v. United States

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Debra Brusch. Certificate of Service:01/09/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-6308] (MLR) [Entered: 01/09/2020 05:18 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellee's motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 16 ] filed by Mr. Dean Seif Atyia. Resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 02/28/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:32 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Debra Brusch because Addendum is not in compliance with the rules. See Letter for necessary corrections. Corrected brief due: 01/16/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 01/09/2020 03:22 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION filed by Mr. Dean Seif Atyia for Department Of Veterans Affairs, USA and VET to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 01/09/2020. [19-6308] (DSA) [Entered: 01/09/2020 03:12 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 **LOCKED**CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Debra Brusch. Certificate of Service:01/09/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-6308]-Brief not in compliance with the rules. Corrected brief due: 01/16/2020.--[Edited 01/09/2020 by SSS] (MLR) [Entered: 01/09/2020 02:57 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Debra Brusch because the designation of lower court documents should include a description, record entry number, and the full Page ID# range for each document; citations to the lower court record should include a description, record entry number, and Page ID# for the relevant portion of the document. Corrected brief due: 01/10/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 12/30/2019 09:18 AM]
December 28, 2019 Filing 13 ***LOCKED--SEE CORRECTION LETTER [ # 14 ]***APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Debra Brusch Certificate of Service:12/28/2019. Argument Request: not requested. [19-6308]--[Edited 12/30/2019 by CAM] (MLR) [Entered: 12/28/2019 03:56 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:09 AM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 12/17/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 12/13/2019 08:29 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Debra Brusch. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2019. [19-6308] (MLR) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:17 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Appellant Debra Brusch. Certificate of Service:12/06/2019. [19-6308] (MLR) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:16 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Mattea L. Rolin for Appellant Debra Brusch Certificate of Service: 12/06/2019. [19-6308] (MLR) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:15 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Debra Brusch by Mattea L. Rolin. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2019. [19-6308] (MLR) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:13 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Department Of Veterans Affairs, USA and VET by Dean S. Atyia. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2019. [19-6308] (DSA) [Entered: 11/26/2019 05:55 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:19 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:18 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/30/2019, appellee brief due 01/29/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 11/20/2019 08:54 AM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 11/20/2019 08:52 AM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Debra Brusch. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 11/20/2019 08:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Debra Brusch v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VETERANS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Dean Seif Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dean Seif Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Dean Seif Atyia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBRA BRUSCH, Individual and Widow of Robert Terrance Brusch, deceased
Represented By: Mattea L. Rolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?