Oak Ridge Envtl Peace Alliance, et al v. James Perry, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: RALPH HUTCHISON, OAK RIDGE ENVIRONMENTAL PEACE ALLIANCE, ED SULLIVAN, LINDA EWALD, NUCLEAR WATCH OF NEW MEXICO, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. and JACK CARL HOEFER
Defendant / Appellant: JAMES RICHARD PERRY, Secretary, United States Department of Energy and LISA E. GORDON-HAGERTY, Administrator, National Nuclear Security Administration
Case Number: 19-6332
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 Letter sent by Mediation Office to hold briefing in abeyance pending mediation. A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE the earlier of January 30, 2020, or within seven calendar days of a decision by Judge Reeves on the pending Motion to Enforce Judgment (District Court Doc. 67). [19-6332, 19-6391] (LMR) [Entered: 12/18/2019 08:35 AM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/02/2020 is hereby canceled and may be reset at a future date. [19-6332, 19-6391] (LMR) [Entered: 12/18/2019 08:32 AM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William Nicholson Lawton for Appellees Cross-Appellants Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Nuclear Watch of New Mexico and Oak Ridge Environmental Peace Alliance. Certificate of Service: 12/13/2019. [19-6332]--[Edited 12/13/2019 by SSS] (WNL) [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:23 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cross-Appellants Linda Ewald, Jack Carl Hoefer, Mr. Ralph Hutchison, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Nuclear Watch of New Mexico, Oak Ridge Environmental Peace Alliance and Mr. Ed Sullivan by William N. Lawton. Certificate of Service: 12/13/2019. [19-6332] (WNL) [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:22 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled for 01/02/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Robert Kaiser will include BOTH CA Nos. 19-6332 and 19-6391. [Please open notice found on CA No. 19-6332 for important details and deadlines.] [19-6332, 19-6391] (LMR) [Entered: 12/11/2019 04:58 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance. The briefing schedule issued November 27, 2019 is cancelled. Upon completion of the filing of the case opening forms in cross-appeal 19-6391, a new consolidate briefing schedule will issue. (SSS) [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:22 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER SENT to all parties, regarding amended caption. (SSS) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:59 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. James Maysonett for Appellants Lisa E. Gordon-Hagerty and James Richard Perry. Certificate of Service:12/10/2019. [19-6332] (JM) [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:11 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Lisa E. Gordon-Hagerty and James Richard Perry by James A. Maysonett. Certificate of Service: 12/02/2019. [19-6332] (JM) [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:01 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/15/2020. appellee brief now due 02/14/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:03 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/02/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Robert Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:59 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:57 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/06/2020; appellee brief due 02/05/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 11/27/2019 08:21 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 11/26/2019 04:42 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Lisa E. Gordon-Hagerty and James Richard Perry. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 11/26/2019 04:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oak Ridge Envtl Peace Alliance, et al v. James Perry, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RALPH HUTCHISON
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OAK RIDGE ENVIRONMENTAL PEACE ALLIANCE
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ED SULLIVAN
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINDA EWALD
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NUCLEAR WATCH OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACK CARL HOEFER
Represented By: William Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES RICHARD PERRY, Secretary, United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Thomas K. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LISA E. GORDON-HAGERTY, Administrator, National Nuclear Security Administration
Represented By: Thomas K. Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?