Lisa Schafer v. Allied Interstate LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: LISA J. SCHAFER, individually and on behalf of similarly situated persons
Defendant / Appellant: RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P., LVNV FUNDING, LLC and ALLIED INTERSTATE LLC
Case Number: 20-1755
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending disposition of the Appellants' motion to hold case in abeyance. (CAM) [Entered: 10/08/2020 09:38 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 17 ]; previously filed by Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. Response from Attorney Mr. Curtis Warner for Appellee Lisa J. Schafer. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1755] (CW) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:42 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION filed by Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. to hold case in abeyance. Certificate of Service: 09/18/2020. [20-1755] (BAS) [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:34 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE AS TYPE OF DOCUMENT: MOTION; RELIEF: HOLD CASE IN ABEYANCE***MOTION filed by Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. to extend timeCertificate of Service: 09/17/2020. [20-1755]--[Edited 09/18/2020 by CAM] (BAS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:27 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Allied Interstate LLC regarding Allied Interstate LLC's Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Automatic Stay. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2020. [20-1755]--[Edited 09/14/2020 by CAM] (BAS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:52 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 09/10/2020 is hereby canceled. (MLB) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:12 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/13/2020;. appellee brief due 11/12/2020; (CAM) [Entered: 08/31/2020 09:59 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Update fee status change to paid. (CAM) [Entered: 08/31/2020 09:57 AM]
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 ***DEFECTIVE ENTRY--COUNSEL ADVISED THE $505.00 APPELLATE FILING FEE IS DUE IN THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT***Original Proceeding fee paid Mr. Christopher R. Murphy for Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. Fee Amount: $500.00 Receipt Number: B06-69093-52.. [20-1755]--[Edited 08/28/2020 by CAM] (CRM) [Entered: 08/26/2020 05:41 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. fCertificate of Service: 08/25/2020. [20-1755] (BAS) [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:53 AM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Appellants Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. Certificate of Service: 08/18/2020. [20-1755] (BAS) [Entered: 08/18/2020 07:09 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Brian Adair Sutherland for Appellants Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P... Certificate of Service: 08/18/2020. [20-1755] (BAS) [Entered: 08/18/2020 07:07 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. by Brian A. Sutherland. Certificate of Service: 08/17/2020. [20-1755] (BAS) [Entered: 08/17/2020 09:12 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/10/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:06 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:04 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Curtis Warner for Appellee Lisa J. Schafer Certificate of Service: 08/12/2020. [20-1755] (CW) [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:51 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Lisa J. Schafer by Curtis C. Warner. Certificate of Service: 08/11/2020. [20-1755] (CW) [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:42 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:33 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Allied Interstate LLC, LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lisa Schafer v. Allied Interstate LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA J. SCHAFER, individually and on behalf of similarly situated persons
Represented By: Bert Thomas Golden
Represented By: Curtis Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher R. Murphy
Represented By: Brian Adair Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LVNV FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Murphy
Represented By: Brian Adair Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALLIED INTERSTATE LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Murphy
Represented By: Brian Adair Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?