Assn of Amer Phys & Surgeons v. FDA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS & SURGEONS
Defendant / Appellee: GARY L. DISBROW, Ph. D., Acting Director, Biomedical Advanced Research & Development Authority, in his official capacity, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, STEPHEN HAHN, MD, Commissioner of Food & Drugs, in his official capacity, BIOMEDICAL ADVANCED RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY and ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of Health & Human Services, in his official capacity
Case Number: 20-1784
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER filed: The motion for an injunction pending appeal is DENIED [ # 8 ]. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Chief Circuit Judge; Alice M. Batchelder and David W. McKeague, Circuit Judges. (SSS) [Entered: 09/24/2020 10:44 AM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 16 ] filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/28/2020, appellee brief now due 11/27/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:19 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:46 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, Biomedical Advanced Research & Development Authority, Gary L. Disbrow, FDA, Stephen Hahn, MD and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services by Scott R. McIntosh. Certificate of Service: 09/15/2020. [20-1784] (SRM) [Entered: 09/15/2020 12:30 PM]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed denying petition for initial en banc hearing [ # 11 ] filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly. Entered by order of the court. (BLH) [Entered: 09/15/2020 06:37 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons regarding Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief (Doc. 8) Certificate of Service: 09/01/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:17 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 8 ]; previously filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons. Response from Attorney Mr. Lewis Yelin for Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, Biomedical Advanced Research & Development Authority, Gary L. Disbrow, Stephen Hahn, MD, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and FDA. Certificate of Service: 08/31/2020. [20-1784] (LY) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:23 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 PETITION for initial en banc hearing filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons. Certificate of Service: 08/31/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 08/31/2020 12:22 AM]
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons. Certificate of Service: 08/26/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:11 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Appellant Association of American Physicians & Surgeons.. Certificate of Service: 08/21/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 08/21/2020 11:56 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons for injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2020. [20-1784]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by SSS] (ALS) [Entered: 08/21/2020 10:48 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Association of American Physicians & Surgeons for Emergency Injunctive Relief Certificate of Service: 05/05/2020. [20-1784] --[Edited 08/20/2020 by AEG]-Counsel instructed to refile the motion using the correct docket event (Motion/Stipulation&motion&Expedite&injunction pending appeal).--[Edited 08/21/2020 by SSS] (ALS) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:51 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew L. Schlafly for Appellant Association of American Physicians & Surgeons Certificate of Service: 08/19/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:48 AM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Association of American Physicians & Surgeons by Andrew L. Schlafly. Certificate of Service: 08/18/2020. [20-1784] (ALS) [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:51 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, Biomedical Advanced Research & Development Authority, Gary L. Disbrow, FDA, Stephen Hahn, MD and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services by Lewis S. Yelin. Certificate of Service: 08/18/2020. [20-1784] (LY) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:32 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/28/2020; appellee brief due 10/27/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:08 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:06 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Association of American Physicians & Surgeons. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Assn of Amer Phys & Surgeons v. FDA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PHYSICIANS & SURGEONS
Represented By: Andrew L. Schlafly
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY L. DISBROW, Ph. D., Acting Director, Biomedical Advanced Research & Development Authority, in his official capacity
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN HAHN, MD, Commissioner of Food & Drugs, in his official capacity
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BIOMEDICAL ADVANCED RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of Health & Human Services, in his official capacity
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?