Darryl Johnson v. Miller, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MAY, SERGEANT BRADFORD, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER O'CONNELL, F. ARTIS, Deputy Warden, SERGEANT BRICIFORD and CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MILLER
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARRYL JOHNSON
Case Number: 20-2087
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. (ASM) [Entered: 12/29/2020 05:00 PM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER SENT to Mr. Darryl Johnson, to submit application to proceed in forma pauperis, trust account statement and correspondence to District Court. (ASM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 02:48 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 TENDERED prisoner trust account statement. Received from Party Mr. Darryl Johnson. (ASM) [Entered: 12/09/2020 04:13 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 CORRESPONDENCE: memorandum from MDOC regarding the Legal Writer Program by Mr. Darryl Johnson. (ASM) [Entered: 12/09/2020 04:10 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 District Court Deficiency notice filed 11/10/2020, RE 10, regarding fee (ASM) [Entered: 11/12/2020 05:33 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (ASM) [Entered: 11/06/2020 01:54 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:26 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Darryl Johnson. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darryl Johnson v. Miller, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT BRADFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER O'CONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. ARTIS, Deputy Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT BRICIFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRYL JOHNSON
Represented By: Darryl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?