Resurrection School, et al v. Robert Gordon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CAROL A. SIEMON, in her official capacity as the Ingham County Prosecuting Attorney, LINDA VAIL, in her official capacity as the Health Officer of Ingham County, DANA NESSEL, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Michigan and ROBERT GORDON, in his official capacity as the Director of the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHANIE SMITH, individially and as next friend on behalf of her minor child F.S. next friend of F.S., CHRISTOPHER MIANECKI, individually and as next friend on behalf of his minor chilidren C.M., Z.M., and N.M. next friend of C.M. next friend of Z.M. next friend of N.M., RESURRECTION SCHOOL, STEPHANIE SMITH, individually and as next friend on behalf of her minor child F.S. and CHRISTOPHER MIANECKI, individually and as next friend on behalf of his minor chilidren C.M., Z.M., and N.M.
Case Number: 20-2256
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Erin Elizabeth Mersino for Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith. Certificate of Service: 02/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:53 PM]
February 15, 2021 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith by Robert J. Muise. Certificate of Service: 02/15/2021. [20-2256] (RJM) [Entered: 02/15/2021 08:45 AM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/16/2021;. appellee brief due 03/17/2021; (VLP) [Entered: 01/06/2021 03:24 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Dana Nessel by Rebecca A. Berels. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2021. [20-2256] (RAB) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:54 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Dana Nessel by Ann M. Sherman. Certificate of Service: 01/06/2021. [20-2256] (AMS) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:52 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Erin Elizabeth Mersino for Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:18 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Erin Elizabeth Mersino for Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith.. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:16 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith by Erin Elizabeth Mersino. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-2256] (EEM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:50 AM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Carol A. Siemon and Linda Vail by Sarah K. Osburn. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (SKO) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:36 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Bonnie G. Toskey for Appellees Carol A. Siemon and Linda Vail Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (BGT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:30 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Linda Vail and Carol A. Siemon by Bonnie G. Toskey. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (BGT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:29 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Robert Gordon by Raymond O. Howd. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (ROH) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:16 AM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Robert Gordon by Joseph T. Froehlich. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (JTF) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:14 AM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Robert Gordon by Daniel J. Ping. Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2256] (DJP) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:11 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:44 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Christopher Mianecki, Resurrection School and Stephanie Smith. Transcript needed: n. (VLP) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Resurrection School, et al v. Robert Gordon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL A. SIEMON, in her official capacity as the Ingham County Prosecuting Attorney
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Sarah K. Osburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA VAIL, in her official capacity as the Health Officer of Ingham County
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Sarah K. Osburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANA NESSEL, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Ann M. Sherman
Represented By: Rebecca Ashley Berels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT GORDON, in his official capacity as the Director of the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Daniel John Ping
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Represented By: Raymond O. Howd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHANIE SMITH, individially and as next friend on behalf of her minor child F.S. next friend of F.S.
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Mersino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER MIANECKI, individually and as next friend on behalf of his minor chilidren C.M., Z.M., and N.M. next friend of C.M. next friend of Z.M. next friend of N.M.
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Mersino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RESURRECTION SCHOOL
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Mersino
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHANIE SMITH, individually and as next friend on behalf of her minor child F.S.
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Mersino
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER MIANECKI, individually and as next friend on behalf of his minor chilidren C.M., Z.M., and N.M.
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Mersino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?