Kyle Richards v. Heidi Washington, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JPAY INC., DON DEFORGE, A.R.U.S. and HEIDI E. WASHINGTON, Director, MDOC
Plaintiff / Appellant: KYLE BRANDON RICHARDS
Case Number: 20-2272
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Kyle Brandon Richards Certificate of Service:01/16/2021. Argument Request: not received. (MTW) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:03 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (MTW) [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:59 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Kyle Brandon Richards dated 01/16/2021. (MTW) [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:56 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Kyle Brandon Richards to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 01/16/2021. (MTW) [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:52 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (MTW) [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:24 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Kyle Brandon Richards dated 12/31/2020. (MTW) [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:23 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Kyle Brandon Richards to proceed in forma pauperis dated 12/31/2020. (MTW) [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:21 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee 30 days. Fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis now due February 22, 2021. (MTW) [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:56 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order filed 01/14/2021 at RE #38 denying in forma pauperis; plaintiff has 28 days from the date of entry of the order to pay the entire filing fee. (MTW) [Entered: 01/15/2021 11:01 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (MTW) [Entered: 01/04/2021 02:56 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Maria Welker (MTW) [Entered: 01/04/2021 02:53 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Kyle Brandon Richards. Transcript needed: n. (MTW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kyle Richards v. Heidi Washington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPAY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON DEFORGE, A.R.U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEIDI E. WASHINGTON, Director, MDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KYLE BRANDON RICHARDS
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?