Michael Williamson v. Harold May
Respondent / Appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: MICHAEL WILLIAMSON
Case Number: 20-3084
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Appellant MOTION filed by Michael Williamson to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 02/01/2020. (MMP) [Entered: 02/07/2020 11:40 AM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mr. Harold May by Jerri L Fosnaught. Certificate of Service: 02/04/2020. [20-3084] (JLF) [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:27 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 01/21/2020 12:38 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Michael Williamson. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 01/21/2020 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Williamson v. Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Represented By: Jerri L. Fosnaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MICHAEL WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Michael Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?