Ronald Smith v. U.S. Bank National Assn
Appellant: RONALD J. SMITH
Debtor: In re: RONALD J. SMITH
Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Certificate Holders of Bear Sterns Asset-Backed Securities LLC Asset-Backed Certificate Series 2004-HE5
Case Number: 20-3150
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 9, 2021 Summary Smith v. U.S. Bank National Association

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Mr. David Arthur Wallace for U.S. Bank National Association to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 02/11/2020. [20-3150] (DAW) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:52 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 *LOCKED*MOTION filed by Mr. David Arthur Wallace for U.S. Bank National Association to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction Certificate of Service: 02/11/2020. [20-3150] ***COUNSEL: Incorrect event selected. Please refile using event "Motion" - relief category "Dispositive/Disposition" - and relief "dismiss case - jurisdiction". Call the clerk if you have any questions at (513) 564-7012. *** --[Edited 02/11/2020 by AEG] (DAW) [Entered: 02/11/2020 03:43 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Appellant **AMENDED** EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND/OR STAY PENDING APPEAL filed by Ronald J. Smith. Certificate of service: 02/11/2020. (AEG) [Entered: 02/11/2020 12:01 PM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee U.S. Bank National Association by David A. Wallace. Certificate of Service: 02/10/2020. [20-3150] (DAW) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:16 PM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Appellant EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Ronald J. Smith for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and/or Stay Pending Appeal. Certificate of service: 02/10/2020. (AEG) [Entered: 02/10/2020 11:04 AM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (AEG) [Entered: 02/10/2020 11:02 AM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ronald J. Smith. Transcript needed: y. (AEG) [Entered: 02/10/2020 10:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ronald Smith v. U.S. Bank National Assn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RONALD J. SMITH
Represented By: Ronald J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: In re: RONALD J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Certificate Holders of Bear Sterns Asset-Backed Securities LLC Asset-Backed Certificate Series 2004-HE5
Represented By: Karen M. Cadieux
Represented By: David Arthur Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?