Daniel Stolz v. J & B Steel Erectors, Inc., et al
Defendant: TERRACON CONSULTANTS, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: D.A.G. CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., PENDLETON CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC, J & B STEEL ERECTORS, INC. and TRIVERSITY CONSTRUCTION CO., LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: DANIEL STOLZ
Case Number: 20-3291
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/10/2020. appellee brief now due 09/08/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 05/07/2020 03:11 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 24 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/13/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/07/2020 03:09 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 23 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/08/2020. appellee brief now due 07/07/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 04/16/2020 11:45 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 22 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/07/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/16/2020 11:44 AM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Susan Salyer for Appellee D.A.G. Construction Co., Inc. Certificate of Service: 04/07/2020. [20-3291]--[Edited 04/08/2020 by RLJ] (SS) [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:31 PM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Susan Salyer for Appellee Pendleton Construction Group, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/07/2020. [20-3291]--[Edited 04/08/2020 by RLJ] (SS) [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:28 PM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Susan Salyer for Appellee Triversity Construction Co., LLC Certificate of Service: 04/07/2020. [20-3291]--[Edited 04/08/2020 by RLJ] (SS) [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:25 PM]
March 31, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/11/2020; appellee brief due 06/09/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:27 AM]
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Colleen M. Blandford for Appellee J & B Steel Erectors, Inc. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2020. [20-3291] (CMB) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:38 AM]
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee J & B Steel Erectors, Inc. by Colleen M. Blandford. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2020. [20-3291] (CMB) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:33 AM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen Marie Myers for Appellant Daniel Stolz. Certificate of Service:03/27/2020. [20-3291] (KMM) [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:11 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen Marie Myers for Appellant Daniel Stolz Certificate of Service: 03/27/2020. [20-3291] (KMM) [Entered: 03/27/2020 12:52 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Daniel Stolz by Kristen Myers. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2020. [20-3291] (KMM) [Entered: 03/27/2020 12:11 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Ms. Stephanie Marlene Day for Daniel Stolz. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2020. [20-3291] (SMD) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:31 AM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Daniel Stolz by Stephanie M. Day. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2020. [20-3291] (SMD) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:20 AM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 **LOCKED - UPDATED FORM DOCKETED AT RE 21 BELOW** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Susan Salyer for Appellee D.A.G. Construction Co., Inc. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2020. [20-3291]--[Edited 03/26/2020 by RLJ]--[Edited 04/08/2020 by RLJ] (SS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:49 AM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 **LOCKED - UPDATED FORM DOCKETED AT RE 19 BELOW** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Susan Salyer for Appellee Triversity Construction Co., LLC. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2020. [20-3291]--[Edited 03/26/2020 by RLJ]--[Edited 04/08/2020 by RLJ] (SS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:48 AM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 **LOCKED - UPDATED FORM DOCKETED AT RE 20 BELOW** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Susan Salyer for Appellee Pendleton Construction Group, LLC. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2020. [20-3291]--[Edited 03/26/2020 by RLJ]--[Edited 04/08/2020 by RLJ] (SS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:45 AM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees D.A.G. Construction Co., Inc., Pendleton Construction Group, LLC and Triversity Construction Co., LLC by Stephen J. Patsfall. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2020. [20-3291] (SJP) [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:39 AM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees D.A.G. Construction Co., Inc., Pendleton Construction Group, LLC and Triversity Construction Co., LLC by Stephen M. Yeager. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2020. [20-3291] (SMY) [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:34 AM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees D.A.G. Construction Co., Inc., Pendleton Construction Group, LLC and Triversity Construction Co., LLC by Susan M. Salyer. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2020. [20-3291] (SS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:30 AM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:18 PM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:16 PM]
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:55 AM]
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Daniel Stolz. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Daniel Stolz v. J & B Steel Erectors, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D.A.G. CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.
Represented By: Susan Salyer
Represented By: Stephen Michael Yeager
Represented By: Stephen J. Patsfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENDLETON CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Susan Salyer
Represented By: Stephen Michael Yeager
Represented By: Stephen J. Patsfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J & B STEEL ERECTORS, INC.
Represented By: Jordan T. Steiner
Represented By: Colleen M. Blandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRIVERSITY CONSTRUCTION CO., LLC
Represented By: Susan Salyer
Represented By: Stephen Michael Yeager
Represented By: Stephen J. Patsfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL STOLZ
Represented By: Stephanie Marlene Day
Represented By: Kristen Marie Myers
Represented By: Caroline M. Drennen
Represented By: Brett Colbert Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRACON CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?