Novia Communications, LLC v. Jesse Weatherby, et al
Defendant: ORION MEDIA MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: JESSE WEATHERBY and COMMUNITY BROADCAST GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: NOVIA COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Case Number: 20-3608
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF FROM 19-3421 ***FILED PER COURT ORDER 07/30/2020 *** filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC. (AEG) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:15 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPELLEE BRIEF from 19-3421 ***FILED PER COURT ORDER 07/30/2020*** filed by Mr. James Paul Silk, Jr. for Jesse Weatherby and Community Broadcast Group, Inc.. Argument Request: not requested. (AEG) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:13 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 APPELLANT BRIEF from 19-3421 *** FILED PER COURT ORDER 07/30/2020*** filed by Mr. John C. Barron for Novia Communications, LLC. Argument Request: requested. (AEG) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:11 PM]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER filed: Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED, that the parties motion is GRANTED. The briefs filed in Case No. 19-3421, are treated as filed in this case. The matter will be submitted to the panel without further briefing or argument. [ # 13 ]. Entered by order of the court. (AEG) [Entered: 07/30/2020 05:52 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 16 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC. Certificate of Service:07/08/2020. [20-3608] (MTK) [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:59 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Jesse Weatherby by James P. Silk, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/24/2020. [20-3608] (JPS) [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:08 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Jesse Weatherby by Susan B. Nelson. Certificate of Service: 06/24/2020. [20-3608] (SBN) [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:07 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION filed by Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Novia Communications, LLC and James P. Silk, Jr. for Jesse Weatherby and Community Broadcast Group, Inc.to adopt briefs filed in case Sixth Circuit Case No. 19-3421 on 06/17/2019. Certificate of Service: 06/23/2020. [20-3608] (MTK) [Entered: 06/23/2020 10:09 AM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC by John C. Barron. Certificate of Service: 06/22/2020. [20-3608] (JCB) [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:32 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] (MTK) [Entered: 06/17/2020 01:49 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC by Matthew T. Kemp. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] (MTK) [Entered: 06/17/2020 01:46 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Paul Silk, Jr. for Appellees Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Jesse Weatherby Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] (JPS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:04 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Paul Silk, Jr. for Appellees Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Jesse Weatherby Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] (JPS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:04 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Paul Silk, Jr. for Appellees Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Jesse Weatherby Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] (JPS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:03 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 [DISREGARD] [See Doc. 14] APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jesse Weatherby, Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Orion Media Management, LLC by Susan B. Nelson. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] --[Edited 06/24/2020 by Case Manager Bryant Crutcher] (SBN) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:01 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 [DISREGARD] [See Doc. 15] APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Community Broadcast Group, Inc. and Orion Media Management, LLC by James P. Silk, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608] --[Edited 06/24/2020 by Case Manager Bryant Crutcher] (JPS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 09:58 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 ***ENTRY LOCKED - CORRECTED APPEARANCE FORM FILED.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jesse Weatherby by James P. Silk, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3608]--[Edited 06/19/2020 by KSF] (JPS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 09:51 AM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: Appellant brief due 07/20/2020. Appellee brief due 08/19/2020. (BLC) [Entered: 06/10/2020 02:39 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 06/10/2020 02:38 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Novia Communications, LLC. Hearing held: n. (BLC) [Entered: 06/10/2020 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Novia Communications, LLC v. Jesse Weatherby, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE WEATHERBY
Represented By: James Paul Silk Jr.
Represented By: Susan Baum Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMUNITY BROADCAST GROUP, INC.
Represented By: James Paul Silk Jr.
Represented By: Susan Baum Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NOVIA COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Represented By: John C. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION MEDIA MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?