Robert Taglione v. Charter Communications, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDREW LUCAS and ROBERT TAGLIONE
Case Number: 20-3680
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:25 PM]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER filed to dismiss Andrew Lucas as party to the appeal pursuant to the stipulation filed August 19, 2020. (SSS) [Entered: 08/20/2020 10:02 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Gary A. Reeve for Robert Taglione. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-3680]--[Edited 08/20/2020 by SSS] (GAR) [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:27 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION filed to dismiss Andrew Lucas as party to the appeal. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Gary A. Reeve for Appellants Andrew Lucas and Robert Taglione. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2020. [20-3680] (GAR) [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:26 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a stipulation to dismiss Andrew Lucas as a party in this appeal is due 08/19/2020. The appeal shall proceed as to all remaining parties. [Please open letter for important details and deadlines. Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:37 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 07/28/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 07/13/2020 01:58 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/19/2020; appellee brief due 09/18/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:56 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Gary A. Reeve for Andrew Lucas and Robert Taglione. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-3680] (GAR) [Entered: 07/10/2020 12:15 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Joseph Ozmer, II for Appellee Charter Communications, LLC Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-3680] (JO) [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:31 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charter Communications, LLC by Abigail Stecker Romero. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-3680] (ASR) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:48 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charter Communications, LLC by Joseph W. Ozmer II. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-3680] (JO) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:45 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Robert Taglione and Andrew Lucas by Gary A. Reeve. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3680] (GAR) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:58 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 07/20/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:37 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:35 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 4 ], filed by Mr. Gary A. Reeve on behalf of Ms. Karen L. Poling, for Robert Taglione and Andrew Lucas. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (CAM) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:52 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 3 ], filed by Mr. Gary A. Reeve for Robert Taglione and Andrew Lucas is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 07/02/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:45 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Gary A. Reeve for Appellants Andrew Lucas and Robert Taglione Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3680] (GAR) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:16 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Gary A. Reeve for Appellants Andrew Lucas and Robert Taglione. Certificate of Service:06/29/2020. [20-3680] (GAR) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:15 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 ***LOCKED-SEE NOTIFICATION [8]***APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Andrew Lucas and Robert Taglione by Karen L. Poling. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3680]--[Edited 06/29/2020 by CAM] (GAR) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:14 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 ***LOCKED-SEE DEFICIENCY NOTICE [ # 7 ]***APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Robert Taglione and Andrew Lucas by Gary A. Reeve. Certificate of Service: 06/29/2020. [20-3680]--[Edited 06/29/2020 by CAM] (GAR) [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:13 AM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 06/26/2020 04:15 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Robert Taglione and Andrew Lucas. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 06/26/2020 04:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Taglione v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Carolyn Anne Davis
Represented By: Joseph Ozmer II
Represented By: Abigail Stecker Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW LUCAS
Represented By: Gary A. Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT TAGLIONE
Represented By: Gary A. Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?