Lenora Stephens v. National City Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., YARBOROUGH LAW FIRM, ROBERT J. KING, III, HUTCHENS LAW FIRM, aka Hutchens, Senter, Britton Law Firm, JOHN H. BRITTON, JIM ROHR, Former CEO PNC Bank, GARRIS NEIL YARBOROUGH, PHILLIP A. HELLER, BRITTON LAW, LAURA CAUPER, Authorized signer for National City Bank, H. MITCHELL COLVIN, H. TERRY HUTCHENS, LAW FIRM OF BROOKS, PIERCE, MCLENDON, HUMPHREY AND LEONARD, PROVIDENT FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., CHRISTOPHER J. CAREY, Chief Executive Financial Officer, WILLIAM S. DEMCHAK, REBECCA J. BROWN, Assistant. Vice President National City Bank, NATIONAL CITY CORPORATION, MCGRIFF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., dba Bridge Title Group, PETER RASKIND, CEO National City Bank, CUMBERLAND COUNTY COURT, NC, SUBSTITUTE TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC., LAW FIRM OF BROOKS, PIERCE, MCLENDON, HUMPHREY AND LEONARD, LLP and H. MITCHELL COLVIN, JR.
Plaintiff / Appellant: LENORA STEPHENS
Case Number: 20-3746
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael L. Wiery for Appellees Hutchens Law Firm, H. Terry Hutchens and Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. Certificate of Service: 08/24/2020. [20-3746] (MLW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:45 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Hutchens Law Firm, H. Terry Hutchens and Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. by Michael L. Wiery. Certificate of Service: 08/24/2020. [20-3746] (MLW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:42 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee H. Mitchell Colvin by George H. Carr. Certificate of Service: 08/19/2020. [20-3746] (GHC) [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:53 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/24/2020; appellee brief due 10/27/2020. (REO) [Entered: 08/12/2020 10:42 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Update fee status change to paid. (REO) [Entered: 08/12/2020 10:41 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees John H. Britton and Garris Neil Yarborough by David J. Fagnilli. Certificate of Service: 07/22/2020. [20-3746] (DJF) [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:58 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Shane Andrew Lawson for Appellees Robert J. King, III and Law Firm of Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey and Leonard Certificate of Service: 07/20/2020. [20-3746] (SAL) [Entered: 07/20/2020 12:32 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Robert J. King, III and Law Firm of Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey and Leonard by Richard C.O. Rezie. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2020. [20-3746] (RCR) [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:35 AM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ***LOCKED - must be refiled using the attorney's own PACER account*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Robert J. King, III and Law Firm of Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey and Leonard by Richard C.O. Rezie. Certificate of Service: 07/17/2020. [20-3746]--[Edited 07/17/2020 by REO] (SAL) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:18 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Law Firm of Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey and Leonard and Robert J. King, III by Shane A. Lawson. Certificate of Service: 07/17/2020. [20-3746] (SAL) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:16 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 07/14/2020 03:59 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Lenora Stephens. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 07/14/2020 03:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lenora Stephens v. National City Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Harold Toby Schisler II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YARBOROUGH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT J. KING, III
Represented By: Monica A. Sansalone
Represented By: Richard C.O. Rezie
Represented By: Shane Andrew Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUTCHENS LAW FIRM, aka Hutchens, Senter, Britton Law Firm
Represented By: Michael L. Wiery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN H. BRITTON
Represented By: David J. Fagmilli
Represented By: David J. Fagnilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM ROHR, Former CEO PNC Bank
Represented By: Harold Toby Schisler II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARRIS NEIL YARBOROUGH
Represented By: David J. Fagmilli
Represented By: David J. Fagnilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILLIP A. HELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITTON LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA CAUPER, Authorized signer for National City Bank
Represented By: Harold Toby Schisler II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. MITCHELL COLVIN
Represented By: Michael J. Sikora III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. TERRY HUTCHENS
Represented By: Michael L. Wiery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW FIRM OF BROOKS, PIERCE, MCLENDON, HUMPHREY AND LEONARD
Represented By: Monica A. Sansalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROVIDENT FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER J. CAREY, Chief Executive Financial Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM S. DEMCHAK
Represented By: Harold Toby Schisler II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA J. BROWN, Assistant. Vice President National City Bank
Represented By: Harold Toby Schisler II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL CITY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCGRIFF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., dba Bridge Title Group
Represented By: Daniel Adrian Leister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER RASKIND, CEO National City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUMBERLAND COUNTY COURT, NC
Represented By: John H. Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUBSTITUTE TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Michael L. Wiery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW FIRM OF BROOKS, PIERCE, MCLENDON, HUMPHREY AND LEONARD, LLP
Represented By: Monica A. Sansalone
Represented By: Richard C.O. Rezie
Represented By: Shane Andrew Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. MITCHELL COLVIN, JR.
Represented By: Michael J. Sikora III
Represented By: George H. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LENORA STEPHENS
Represented By: Lenora Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?