Alana Harrison v. Montgomery County, OH
Defendant / Appellee: MONTGOMERY COUNTY, OH
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALANA HARRISON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 20-4051
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 22 Errata to Designation of Relevant Sixth Circuit Documents attached to Merit Brief of Appellant Alana Harrison filed 11/30/2020 by Emily White for Alana Harrison. Certificate of Service: 12/01/2020. [20-4051] (EW) [Entered: 12/01/2020 01:34 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 21 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Emily White for Alana Harrison. Certificate of Service: 11/30/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-4051] (EW) [Entered: 11/30/2020 07:46 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 19 ] filed by Mr. Marc E. Dann., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/30/2020. appellee brief now due 12/30/2020. (BSM) [Entered: 11/09/2020 05:21 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION filed by Mr. Marc E. Dann for Alana Harrison to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/09/2020. [20-4051] (MED) [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:20 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:18 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 17 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/03/2020 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:01 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Marc E. Dann for Appellant Alana Harrison Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. [20-4051] (MED) [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:59 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alana Harrison by Emily White. Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. [20-4051] (EW) [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:57 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Marc E. Dann for Appellant Alana Harrison.. Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. [20-4051] (MED) [Entered: 10/20/2020 11:20 AM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alana Harrison by Emily White. Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. [20-4051]***Must refile with correct address info***--[Edited 10/20/2020 by BSM] (EW) [Entered: 10/20/2020 11:18 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen W. Funk for Appellee Montgomery County, OH Certificate of Service: 10/13/2020. [20-4051] (SWF) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:16 AM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alana Harrison by Andrew M. Engel. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2020. [20-4051] (AME) [Entered: 10/12/2020 10:33 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Montgomery County, OH by Emily K. Anglewicz. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4051] (EKA) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:43 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Montgomery County, OH by Stephen W. Funk. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2020. [20-4051] (SWF) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:40 AM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Montgomery County, OH by Anne M. Jagielski. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2020. [20-4051] (AJ) [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:20 AM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alana Harrison by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 10/07/2020. [20-4051] (TZ) [Entered: 10/07/2020 05:56 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/03/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:11 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:10 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alana Harrison by Marc E. Dann. Certificate of Service: 10/06/2020. [20-4051] (MED) [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:08 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/16/2020;. appellee brief due 12/15/2020; (BSM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:54 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Briston Mitchell (BSM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:45 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Alana Harrison. Transcript needed: n. (BSM) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alana Harrison v. Montgomery County, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONTGOMERY COUNTY, OH
Represented By: Anne Jagielski
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Represented By: Emily K. Anglewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALANA HARRISON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Emily White
Represented By: Andrew Mahlon Engel
Represented By: Tom Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?