Reginald Barnes, Sr. v. City of Cleveland, OH, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: REGINALD E BARNES, SR.
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, CONTRACTORS, SUB-CONTRACTORS AND OTHER PARTIES, In Their or Its Official Capacity, Acting outside Scope Environment Individually, JUDGE JOHN A. ADAMS, U.S. District Court of Akron Ohio of the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division, OHIO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, VOLKSWAGEN, INC. & CREDIT COMPANY, INC., CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, CITY OF AVON LAKE, OH, CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH, CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH SHERIFF, AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, CONTRACTORS, SUB-CONTRACTORS, AND OTHER PARTIES, CITY OF AVON, OH, CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH DEPARTMENT OF VEHICLE IMPOUND, CLEVELAND, OH POLICE DEPARTMENT, XEROX CORPORATION, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, LABOR READY-PEOPLE READY, A True Blue Company, CUYAHOGA COUNTY CORRECTIONS CENTER JAIL, CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH PHOTO SAFETY DIVISION, CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU, ACS CORPORATION, JANE & JOHN DOES, CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH, CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, CONTRACTORS, SUB-CONTRACTORS, AND OTHER PARTIES, In Their or Its Official Capacity, Acting Outside Scope of Employment, Individually, CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH DIVISION OF CORRECTIONS, CREDIT ACCEPTANCE COMPANY and OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Case Number: 20-4130
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Reginald E Barnes, Sr. Certificate of Service:12/22/2020. Argument Request: not received. (JEC) [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:30 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/22/2020;. (JEC) [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:24 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Update fee status change to paid. Receipt number 14660127065 (JEC) [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:23 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Reginald E Barnes, Sr.. (JEC) [Entered: 11/09/2020 10:16 AM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (JEC) [Entered: 10/26/2020 11:17 AM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 10/26/2020 11:17 AM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Reginald E Barnes, Sr.. Transcript needed: n. (JEC) [Entered: 10/26/2020 11:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Reginald Barnes, Sr. v. City of Cleveland, OH, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REGINALD E BARNES, SR.
Represented By: Reginald E. Barnes Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, CONTRACTORS, SUB-CONTRACTORS AND OTHER PARTIES, In Their or Its Official Capacity, Acting outside Scope Environment Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE JOHN A. ADAMS, U.S. District Court of Akron Ohio of the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OHIO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VOLKSWAGEN, INC. & CREDIT COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF AVON LAKE, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, CONTRACTORS, SUB-CONTRACTORS, AND OTHER PARTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF AVON, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH DEPARTMENT OF VEHICLE IMPOUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLEVELAND, OH POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XEROX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LABOR READY-PEOPLE READY, A True Blue Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUYAHOGA COUNTY CORRECTIONS CENTER JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH PHOTO SAFETY DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE & JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CLEVELAND, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH AGENTS, EMPLOYEES, CONTRACTORS, SUB-CONTRACTORS, AND OTHER PARTIES, In Their or Its Official Capacity, Acting Outside Scope of Employment, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH DIVISION OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?