Tyrone Harris v. J. M. Wilner
Petitioner / Appellant: TYRONE HARRIS
Respondent / Appellee: J. M. WILNER, Warden
Case Number: 20-5402
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 CORRESPONDENCE: request to send opposing counsel a copy of appellant brief by Mr. Tyrone Harris. (ASM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 04:01 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Tyrone Harris Certificate of Service:05/19/2020. (ASM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 03:58 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Appellant MOTION for permission to have questions answered by responsent filed by Mr. Tyrone Harris. Certificate of service: 04/26/2020. (ASM) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:54 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/12/2020, appellee brief due 07/15/2020. (ASM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:51 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee J. M. Wilner by Kyle M. Melloan. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5402] (KMM) [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:18 AM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee J. M. Wilner by Thomas Lee Gentry. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5402] (TLG) [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:12 AM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee J. M. Wilner by Charles P. Wisdom Jr. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2020. [20-5402] (CPW) [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:09 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 04/16/2020 01:27 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with CAP unnecessary. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrone Harris. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 04/16/2020 01:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tyrone Harris v. J. M. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TYRONE HARRIS
Represented By: Tyrone Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: J. M. WILNER, Warden
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Represented By: Kyle M. Melloan
Represented By: Charles P. Wisdom Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?