Jacqueline Birchfield v. Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK ACQUISITION TRUST, as Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, PREMIER MORTGAGE FUNDING, INCORPORATED, CHASE BANK USA, N.A., DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust and CHASE BANK ACQUISITION TRUST
Plaintiff / Appellant: JACQUELINE BIRCHFIELD
Case Number: 20-5491
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Thompson Baxter for Appellees Chase Bank Acquisition Trust and Chase Bank USA, N.A. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-5491] (JTB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:50 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Chase Bank Acquisition Trust and Chase Bank USA, N.A. by John T. Baxter. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-5491] (JTB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 09:49 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert R. Carl, II for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Select Portfolio Servicing Certificate of Service: 07/09/2020. [20-5491] (RRC) [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:45 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by Robert R. Carl. Certificate of Service: 07/09/2020. [20-5491] (RRC) [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:43 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Jacqueline Birchfield Certificate of Service:07/01/2020. Argument Request: PRO SE (RGF) [Entered: 07/06/2020 03:27 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 Letter sent to all parties regarding the amended caption. (RGF) [Entered: 06/10/2020 11:48 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/24/2020;. appellee brief due 07/27/2020;. (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:21 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:21 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Jacqueline Birchfield. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacqueline Birchfield v. Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK ACQUISITION TRUST, as Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Represented By: Robert R. Carl II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING
Represented By: Robert R. Carl II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PREMIER MORTGAGE FUNDING, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Represented By: John Thompson Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Represented By: Robert R. Carl II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHASE BANK ACQUISITION TRUST
Represented By: John Thompson Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACQUELINE BIRCHFIELD
Represented By: Jacqueline Birchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?