Online Merchants Guild v. Daniel Cameron
Plaintiff / Appellee: ONLINE MERCHANTS GUILD
Defendant / Appellant: DANIEL J. CAMERON, In his official capacity as Attorney General of Kentucky
Case Number: 20-5723
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 18 ] filed by Mr. Matthew Franklin Kuhn., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/16/2020. appellee brief now due 10/16/2020. (JEC) [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:57 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION filed by Mr. Matthew Franklin Kuhn for Daniel J. Cameron to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2020. [20-5723] (MFK) [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:48 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Paul Rafelson. Certificate of Service: 07/13/2020. [20-5723] (PSR) [Entered: 07/13/2020 12:06 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Aaron K. Block. Certificate of Service: 07/13/2020. [20-5723] (AKB) [Entered: 07/13/2020 11:16 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 13 ],, appearance form , [ # 12 ], filed by Mr. Aaron K. Block for Online Merchants Guild and Mr. Paul S. Rafelson for Online Merchants Guild. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (JEC) [Entered: 07/13/2020 11:12 AM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Mark A. Gilbert for Appellee Online Merchants Guild Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 11:36 PM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 13 ***DEFECTIVE FILING. DOCUMENT LOCKED. SEE RE #15***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Paul S. Rafelson. Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723] --[Edited 07/13/2020 by JEC] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 11:28 PM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 12 ***DEFECTIVE FILING. DOCUMENT LOCKED. SEE RE #15***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Aaron K. Block. Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723]--[Edited 07/13/2020 by JEC] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 11:20 PM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Mark A. Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 11:18 PM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED. FORM IS BLANK***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Paul S. Rafelson. Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723] --[Edited 07/13/2020 by JEC] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 11:01 PM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED. FORM IS BLANK***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Aaron K. Block. Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723] --[Edited 07/13/2020 by JEC] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 10:50 PM]
July 12, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED. FORM IS BLANK. SEE RE #11***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Online Merchants Guild by Mark A. Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 07/12/2020. [20-5723] --[Edited 07/13/2020 by JEC] (MAG) [Entered: 07/12/2020 10:40 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/17/2020;. appellee brief due 09/16/2020; (JEC) [Entered: 07/08/2020 09:55 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Matthew Franklin Kuhn for Daniel J. Cameron. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5723] (MFK) [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:39 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Daniel J. Cameron by Victor B. Maddox. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5723] (VBM) [Entered: 07/07/2020 01:59 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew Franklin Kuhn for Appellant Daniel J. Cameron. Certificate of Service:07/07/2020. [20-5723] (MFK) [Entered: 07/07/2020 12:33 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Daniel J. Cameron by Matthew F. Kuhn. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2020. [20-5723] (MFK) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:55 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:47 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Daniel J. Cameron. Transcript needed: y. (JEC) [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Online Merchants Guild v. Daniel Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ONLINE MERCHANTS GUILD
Represented By: Mark A. Gilbert
Represented By: Aaron K. Block
Represented By: Paul S. Rafelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DANIEL J. CAMERON, In his official capacity as Attorney General of Kentucky
Represented By: Victor B. Maddox
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?