Cory Jacobs v. Unknown Number of Unknown Name, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WARDEN, USP MCCREARY, UNKNOWN NUMBER OF UNKNOWN NAMED STAFF, USP-McCreary, EDUCATIONAL, PSYCHOLOGY, MEDICAL AND UNIT TEAM STAFF, USP-Big Sandy, WARDEN, BIG SANDY U.S.P. and DHO STAFF
Plaintiff / Appellant: CORY LEE JACOBS
Case Number: 20-6041
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee or file IFP mtn in District Court due to relocation and the possibility of never receiving the case opening letter. (SSS) [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:07 AM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (SSS) [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:15 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Copy of NOA packet filed in district court received in this court 09/08/2020. (SSS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:09 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:04 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Cory Lee Jacobs. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cory Jacobs v. Unknown Number of Unknown Name, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN, USP MCCREARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN NUMBER OF UNKNOWN NAMED STAFF, USP-McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDUCATIONAL, PSYCHOLOGY, MEDICAL AND UNIT TEAM STAFF, USP-Big Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN, BIG SANDY U.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DHO STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CORY LEE JACOBS
Represented By: Cory Lee Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?