Outdoor One Communications LLC v. Charter Township of Canton, MI
Plaintiff / Appellant: OUTDOOR ONE COMMUNICATIONS LLC
Defendant / Appellee: CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON and CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON, MI
Case Number: 21-1323
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/29/2021;. appellee brief due 07/29/2021; (VLP) [Entered: 05/20/2021 04:33 PM]
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Donald Richard Sheff, II for Outdoor One Communications LLC. fCertificate of Service: 05/20/2021. [21-1323] (DRS) [Entered: 05/20/2021 11:53 AM]
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Donald Richard Sheff, II for Appellant Outdoor One Communications LLC.. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2021. [21-1323] (DRS) [Entered: 05/20/2021 11:41 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Donald Richard Sheff, II for Appellant Outdoor One Communications LLC Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-1323] (DRS) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:37 PM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Outdoor One Communications LLC by Donald R. Sheff II. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-1323] (DRS) [Entered: 05/19/2021 09:36 PM]
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Order Re#36 Filed:04/29/2021. (VLP) [Entered: 05/07/2021 03:23 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charter Township of Canton by Matthew J. Zalewski. Certificate of Service: 04/07/2021. [21-1323] (MJZ) [Entered: 04/07/2021 11:23 AM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED- COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AND ENSURE IT IS A NON EDITABLE PDF**APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Charter Township of Canton by Matthew J. Zalewski. Certificate of Service: 04/07/2021. [21-1323]--[Edited 04/07/2021 by VLP] (MJZ) [Entered: 04/07/2021 11:05 AM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance (VLP) [Entered: 04/05/2021 10:04 AM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 04/05/2021 09:58 AM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Outdoor One Communications LLC. Transcript needed: y. (VLP) [Entered: 04/05/2021 09:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Outdoor One Communications LLC v. Charter Township of Canton, MI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OUTDOOR ONE COMMUNICATIONS LLC
Represented By: Donald Richard Sheff II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zalewski
Represented By: Kristin B. Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON, MI
Represented By: Matthew Jason Zalewski
Represented By: Kristin B. Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?