Wendy Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: WENDY B. ADELSON
Defendant / Appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, nka PHH Mortgage Corporation, Successor by Merger, HSBC BANK USA, NA, Individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, TROTT LAW, P.C., MICHAEL MCDERMOTT and HEIDI MYSAZK
Case Number: 21-2972
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 31, 2023 Wendy Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Filing 42 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert J. Kinggo, III for Mr. Michael McDermott, Ms. Heidi Mysazk and Trott Law, P.C.. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2022. Argument Request: not requested. [21-2972] (RJK) [Entered: 05/26/2022 10:10 AM]
May 25, 2022 Filing 41 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in 20-2204, Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA in 21-2972. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2022. Argument Request: not requested. [20-2204, 21-2972] (NSR) [Entered: 05/25/2022 12:40 PM]
May 25, 2022 Filing 40 ***LOCKED - must be filed only in case the parties are participating in, 21-2972*** APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert J. Kinggo, III for Trott Law, P.C., Mr. Michael McDermott and Ms. Heidi Mysazk in 21-2972. Certificate of Service: 05/25/2022. Argument Request: not requested. [20-2204, 21-2972]--[Edited 05/25/2022 by REO] (RJK) [Entered: 05/25/2022 08:55 AM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 39 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 38 ] filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. The brief filed on 4/26/2022 is considered timely filed. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 04/28/2022 03:36 PM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 04/28/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:17 PM]
April 26, 2022 Filing 37 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972.. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2022. Argument Request: requested. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 04/26/2022 12:00 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 36 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/25/2022; appellee brief due 05/25/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:10 AM]
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER filed denying motion to file oversize brief [ # 31 ] filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:05 AM]
April 5, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972 regarding Defendants Response to Motion for Leave for Enhancement of Word and Page Limit to Corrected Opening Brief Certificate of Service: 04/05/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 04/05/2022 07:53 PM]
March 30, 2022 Filing 33 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to file an oversize brief. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 03/30/2022 11:31 AM]
March 29, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 31 ]; previously filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972. Response from Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in 20-2204, Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellees Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA in 21-2972. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (NSR) [Entered: 03/29/2022 09:45 AM]
March 23, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972 to file oversize brief. Certificate of Service: 03/23/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 03/23/2022 10:01 AM]
March 22, 2022 Filing 30 ***LOCKED - please refile as a motion for leave to file an oversized brief*** Corrected second successive motion filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972. If the respondent chooses to file a response, it is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972]--[Edited 03/23/2022 by REO] (WND) [Entered: 03/22/2022 08:23 PM]
March 22, 2022 Filing 29 ***LOCKED - please see RE #42*** CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972.. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2022. Argument Request: requested. [20-2204, 21-2972]--[Edited 04/11/2022 by REO] (WND) [Entered: 03/22/2022 08:19 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 28 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972, please see attached correction letter. Corrected brief due: 03/22/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 03/15/2022 09:18 AM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972 to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 03/14/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 03/15/2022 01:06 AM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 26 ***LOCKED - see correction letter RE #35*** APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972. Certificate of Service: 03/14/2022. Argument Request: requested. [20-2204, 21-2972]--[Edited 03/15/2022 by REO] (WND) [Entered: 03/15/2022 12:11 AM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 25 RULING LETTER SENT granting stipulation to extend time to file brief [ # 24 ] filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. 14 day extension of time granted. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/14/2022; appellee brief now due 04/13/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 02/24/2022 04:47 PM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION filed to extend time to file brief. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972. Certificate of Service: 02/24/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 02/24/2022 01:24 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 23 RULING LETTER SENT granting stipulation to extend time to file brief [ # 22 ] filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. 19 day extension of time granted. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/28/2022; appellee brief now due 03/30/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 02/01/2022 03:29 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION filed to extend time to file brief. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson in 20-2204, 21-2972. Certificate of Service: 02/01/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 02/01/2022 01:32 PM]
December 30, 2021 Filing 21 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/08/2022; appellee brief due 03/10/2022. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 12/30/2021 11:57 AM]
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER filed: The motion [ # 6718623-2 ] [ # 18 ] is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, inasmuch as these appeals will be consolidated for purposes of briefing and submission. [20-2204, 21-2972] (REO) [Entered: 12/30/2021 11:52 AM]
December 6, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson to consolidate cases 21-2972 & 20-2204. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:41 PM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 17 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss 20-2204. (REO) [Entered: 10/28/2021 11:51 AM]
October 26, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/06/2021; appellee brief due 01/05/2022. (REO) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:46 PM]
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson Certificate of Service: 10/25/2021. [21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 10/25/2021 01:16 PM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson. fCertificate of Service: 10/15/2021. [21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 10/15/2021 05:48 PM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson by Wendell N. Davis, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2021. [21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 10/15/2021 01:37 PM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 ***LOCKED - please refile using the entry 'transcript already on file in the district court" ***NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson regarding Transcript already transcribed. Copy Attached. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2021. [21-2972]--[Edited 10/15/2021 by REO] (WND) [Entered: 10/15/2021 12:52 PM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 10/18/2021 further action will be taken. (REO) [Entered: 10/15/2021 12:17 PM]
October 9, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson.. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2021. [21-2972] (WND) [Entered: 10/09/2021 11:36 PM]
October 9, 2021 Filing 9 ***LOCKED - please refile using form 6CA-68, available on our website*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson by Wendell N. Davis, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2021. [21-2972]--[Edited 10/12/2021 by REO] (WND) [Entered: 10/09/2021 11:33 PM]
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA by Jill M. Wheaton. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2021. [21-2972] (JMW) [Entered: 10/08/2021 10:00 AM]
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert J. Kinggo, III for Appellees Mr. Michael McDermott, Ms. Heidi Mysazk and Trott Law, P.C. Certificate of Service: 10/06/2021. [21-2972] (RJK) [Entered: 10/06/2021 11:39 AM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Certificate of Service: 10/05/2021. [21-2972] (NSR) [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:32 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Nasseem S. Ramin. Certificate of Service: 10/05/2021. [21-2972] (NSR) [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:28 PM]
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Michael McDermott, Ms. Heidi Mysazk and Trott Law, P.C. by Robert J. Kinggo, III. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2021. [21-2972] (RJK) [Entered: 10/01/2021 11:02 AM]
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER SENT to Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B. Adelson, Mr. John P. Kapitan for Trott Law, P.C., Mr. Michael McDermott and Ms. Heidi Mysazk, Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA, Mr. Thomas M. Schehr for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ms. Jill Margaret Wheaton for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA, regarding updated caption. (REO) [Entered: 09/28/2021 10:37 AM]
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 09/27/2021 12:51 PM]
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 09/27/2021 12:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wendy Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WENDY B. ADELSON
Represented By: Wendell N. Davis Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, nka PHH Mortgage Corporation, Successor by Merger
Represented By: Nasseem Sara Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Represented By: Jill Margaret Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC BANK USA, NA, Individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES
Represented By: Nasseem Sara Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Represented By: Jill Margaret Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TROTT LAW, P.C.
Represented By: John P. Kapitan
Represented By: Robert J. Kinggo III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL MCDERMOTT
Represented By: John P. Kapitan
Represented By: Robert J. Kinggo III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEIDI MYSAZK
Represented By: John P. Kapitan
Represented By: Robert J. Kinggo III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?