Phil Mills v. Harold May
Petitioner / Appellant: PHIL D. MILS and PHIL D. MILLS
Respondent / Appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Case Number: 21-3451
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mr. Harold May by M. Scott Criss. Certificate of Service: 06/11/2021. [21-3451] (MSC) [Entered: 06/11/2021 10:12 AM]
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION filed by Phil D. Mills regarding request for cap. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. same cap moton as #5 on our docket. Only difference is the certificate of service. (PJE) [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:03 PM]
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Phil D. Mills to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 04/23/2021. (PJE) [Entered: 05/13/2021 09:18 AM]
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Phil D. Mills. (PJE) [Entered: 05/13/2021 09:14 AM]
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Copy of copy of the appeal packet sent to DC for filing from district court filed. (PJE) [Entered: 05/13/2021 09:03 AM]
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia Elder (PJE) [Entered: 05/13/2021 08:59 AM]
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Phil D. Mills. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 05/13/2021 08:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Phil Mills v. Harold May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PHIL D. MILS
Represented By: Phil D. Mils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PHIL D. MILLS
Represented By: Phil D. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Benoit
Represented By: M. Scott Criss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?