Brian Alford v. Annette Chambers-Smith, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRIAN KEITH ALFORD
Defendant / Appellee: ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH, Director, HAROLD MAY, Warden, JOHN MCGAHEE and DAVID J. ROBINSON, Unit Management Chief
Interested Party: STATE OF OHIO
Case Number: 21-3662
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Copy of District Court Order filed - GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall have until SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 to file his motion to appeal in forma pauperis with an accompanying affidavit. (RGF) [Entered: 09/07/2021 08:31 AM]
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Deficiency notice filed. IFP Motion. (MMP) [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:22 PM]
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Interested Party State of Ohio by Tracy L Bradford. Certificate of Service: 08/17/2021. [21-3662]--[Edited 08/20/2021 by MMP]--[Edited 08/20/2021 by MMP] (TLB) [Entered: 08/17/2021 10:17 AM]
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (MMP) [Entered: 07/22/2021 12:18 PM]
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 07/22/2021 12:09 PM]
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Brian Keith Alford. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brian Alford v. Annette Chambers-Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN KEITH ALFORD
Represented By: Brian Keith Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAROLD MAY, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MCGAHEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID J. ROBINSON, Unit Management Chief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Tracy L. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?