April Malone, et al v. Shelby County, TN, et al
Defendant: PAUL HAGERMAN, Assistant District Attorney, Individually and in his Official Capacity, WILLIAM ACRED, OCU Police Officer, in his Official Capacity, SHELBY COUNTY, TN, CHRIS SCRUGGS, Assistant Attorney General, Individually and in his Official Capacity and AUSTIN SCHOLFIELD, Assistant Attorney General, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: CELITRIA WATSON and APRIL MALONE
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF MEMPHIS, TN, THERMAN RICHARDSON, OCU Police Officer, Individually and in his Official Capacity and JONATHAN OVERLY, OCU Police Officer, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Case Number: 21-5246
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for April Malone and Celitria Watson. Certificate of Service: 05/11/2021. Argument Request: not requested. [21-5246] (TLT) [Entered: 05/11/2021 07:23 AM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 The case manager for this case is now: Gretchen Abruzzo (JEC) [Entered: 04/30/2021 12:30 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:22 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Barbaralette G. Davis for Appellee City of Memphis, TN Certificate of Service: 03/29/2021. [21-5246] (BGD) [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:16 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee City of Memphis, TN by Barbaralette G. Davis. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2021. [21-5246] (BGD) [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:12 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/10/2021;. appellee brief due 06/07/2021; (BSM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 08:59 AM]
March 27, 2021 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for April Malone and Celitria Watson. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2021. [21-5246] (TLT) [Entered: 03/27/2021 03:51 PM]
March 27, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Appellants April Malone and Celitria Watson Certificate of Service: 03/27/2021. [21-5246] (TLT) [Entered: 03/27/2021 03:50 PM]
March 27, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Terrell L. Tooten for Appellants April Malone and Celitria Watson.. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2021. [21-5246] (TLT) [Entered: 03/27/2021 03:49 PM]
March 27, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants April Malone and Celitria Watson by Terrell Tooten. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2021. [21-5246] (TLT) [Entered: 03/27/2021 03:47 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Mary Elizabeth McKinney for Appellees Jonathan Overly and Therman Richardson Certificate of Service: 03/18/2021. [21-5246] (MEM) [Entered: 03/18/2021 01:10 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jonathan Overly and Therman Richardson by Deborah Godwin. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2021. [21-5246] (DEG) [Entered: 03/18/2021 01:00 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Therman Richardson and Jonathan Overly by Mary Elizabeth McKinney. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2021. [21-5246] (MEM) [Entered: 03/18/2021 12:53 PM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:28 AM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:27 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is now: Briston S. Mitchell (RB) [Entered: 03/16/2021 04:05 PM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants April Malone and Celitria Watson. Transcript needed: y. (RB) [Entered: 03/16/2021 04:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: April Malone, et al v. Shelby County, TN, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL HAGERMAN, Assistant District Attorney, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ACRED, OCU Police Officer, in his Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELBY COUNTY, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS SCRUGGS, Assistant Attorney General, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN SCHOLFIELD, Assistant Attorney General, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CELITRIA WATSON
Represented By: Terrell L. Tooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: APRIL MALONE
Represented By: Terrell L. Tooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MEMPHIS, TN
Represented By: Barbaralette G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THERMAN RICHARDSON, OCU Police Officer, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Godwin
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN OVERLY, OCU Police Officer, Individually and in his Official Capacity
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Godwin
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?