James Knight, et al v. Metro Govt of Nashville
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES KNIGHT and JASON MAYES
Defendant / Appellee: METROPOLITAN GOVERNMENT OF NASHVILLE & DAVIDSON COUNTY, TN
Case Number: 21-6179
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes by Meggan S. DeWitt. Certificate of Service: 01/25/2022. [21-6179] (MD) [Entered: 01/25/2022 05:33 PM]
January 5, 2022 Filing 17 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/05/2022 12:53 PM]
January 5, 2022 Filing 16 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/26/2022 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 01/05/2022 09:27 AM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/14/2022; appellee brief due 03/14/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 01/03/2022 10:49 AM]
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 01/26/2022 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/22/2021 02:07 PM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Celia Howard O'Leary for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-6179] (CHO) [Entered: 12/16/2021 01:53 PM]
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Celia Howard O'Leary for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes.. Certificate of Service: 12/16/2021. [21-6179] (CHO) [Entered: 12/16/2021 01:51 PM]
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes by Kimberly S. Hermann. Certificate of Service: 12/15/2021. [21-6179] (KSH) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:03 PM]
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes by Celia Howard O'Leary. Certificate of Service: 12/15/2021. [21-6179] (CHO) [Entered: 12/15/2021 10:33 AM]
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Braden H. Boucek for James Knight and Jason Mayes. Certificate of Service: 12/15/2021. [21-6179] (BHB) [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:46 AM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John William Ayers for Appellee Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County, TN Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-6179] (JWA) [Entered: 12/14/2021 05:05 PM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County, TN by John W. Ayers. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-6179] (JWA) [Entered: 12/14/2021 05:05 PM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Metropolitan Government of Nashville & Davidson County, TN by Allison L. Bussell. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-6179] (ALB) [Entered: 12/14/2021 05:03 PM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/10/2022 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:54 PM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes by Braden H. Boucek. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2021. [21-6179] (BHB) [Entered: 12/14/2021 11:36 AM]
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes by Braden H. Boucek. Certificate of Service: 12/13/2021. [21-6179]--[Edited 12/14/2021 by MMP] (BHB) [Entered: 12/13/2021 08:40 PM]
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:58 PM]
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants James Knight and Jason Mayes. Transcript needed: y. (MMP) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Knight, et al v. Metro Govt of Nashville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES KNIGHT
Represented By: Braden H. Boucek
Represented By: Meggan DeWitt
Represented By: Kimberly S. Hermann
Represented By: Celia Howard O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON MAYES
Represented By: Braden H. Boucek
Represented By: Meggan DeWitt
Represented By: Kimberly S. Hermann
Represented By: Celia Howard O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN GOVERNMENT OF NASHVILLE & DAVIDSON COUNTY, TN
Represented By: Allison L. Bussell
Represented By: John William Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?