Robert Annabel, II v. Jackson County, MI Sheriff Department, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT ANNABEL, II
Defendant / Appellee: JACKSON COUNTY, MI SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, ADVANCED HEALTH CARE, GARY SCHUTTE, Sheriff, DEPUTY STEVERSON, UNKNOWN SERGEANT DEPUTY, UNKNOWN DEPUTY 1 and UNKNOWN DEPUTY 2
Case Number: 22-2071
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Distrcit Court Order DE #10 Filed:12/02/2022 DENYING motion for relief from judgment. (LTK) [Entered: 01/06/2023 08:28 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (LTK) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:25 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Robert Annabel, II. (LTK) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:16 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Robert Annabel, II to proceed in forma pauperis. (LTK) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:12 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance. Case held in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion for relief of judgment filed in the district court on 11/07/2022 RE#6. (LTK) [Entered: 11/30/2022 02:51 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 Defendants not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (LTK) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:34 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Leon Korotko. (LTK) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:33 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Robert Annabel, II. Transcript needed: n. (LTK) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Annabel, II v. Jackson County, MI Sheriff Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT ANNABEL, II
Represented By: Robert Annabel II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACKSON COUNTY, MI SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVANCED HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY SCHUTTE, Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY STEVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN SERGEANT DEPUTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN DEPUTY 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN DEPUTY 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?