Mary Whitlatch v. Belmont County, OH, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARY WHITLATCH, Administrator of the Estate of Elzie Lee Leasure (deceased)
Defendant / Appellee: BELMONT COUNTY, OH, BELMONT COUNTY, OH BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, BELMONT COUNTY, OH SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, TIFFANY ENGLISH, Registered Nurse and DEB BUTLER, Registered Nurse
Case Number: 22-4033
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 7 RECORD RECEIVED from Mr. William P. Campbell for Mary Whitlatch. Aty/Pty - CD/DVD, Comment: Phone call and Jail videos, Sealed: None. (MH) [Entered: 02/08/2023 08:17 AM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 6 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. William P. Campbell for Mary Whitlatch. Certificate of Service: 02/06/2023. Argument Request: requested. [22-4033] (WPC) [Entered: 02/06/2023 10:05 AM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/06/2023; appellee brief due 03/08/2023. (GSA) [Entered: 12/28/2022 09:28 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Belmont County, OH, Belmont County, OH Board of Commissioners, Belmont County, OH Sheriff's Department, Deb Butler and Tiffany English by Andrew N. Yosowitz. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2022. [22-4033] (ANY) [Entered: 12/14/2022 11:29 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mary Whitlatch by William P. Campbell. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2022. [22-4033] (WPC) [Entered: 12/14/2022 11:13 AM]
December 13, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Gretchen Abruzzo (GSA) [Entered: 12/13/2022 10:29 AM]
December 13, 2022 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mary Whitlatch. Transcript needed: n. (GSA) [Entered: 12/13/2022 10:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Whitlatch v. Belmont County, OH, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY WHITLATCH, Administrator of the Estate of Elzie Lee Leasure (deceased)
Represented By: William P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELMONT COUNTY, OH
Represented By: Andrew N. Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELMONT COUNTY, OH BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Andrew N. Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELMONT COUNTY, OH SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Andrew N. Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIFFANY ENGLISH, Registered Nurse
Represented By: Andrew N. Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEB BUTLER, Registered Nurse
Represented By: Andrew N. Yosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?