George Poulos v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff / Appellant: GEORGE POULOS, as Administrator, W.W.A. of The Estate of Harold Lewis Parker, Deceased
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 22-4070
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a brief or stipulation to dismiss is due 03/24/2023. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 02/16/2023 09:25 AM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 02/16/2023 09:11 AM]
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/08/2023. appellee brief now due 04/07/2023. (MLB) [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:01 PM]
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 02/22/2023 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 01/23/2023 02:59 PM]
January 10, 2023 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee VA by Laura E. Myron. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2023. [22-4070] (LM) [Entered: 01/10/2023 04:52 PM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Barry Michael Ward for Appellant Mr. George Poulos Certificate of Service: 01/09/2023. [22-4070] (BMW) [Entered: 01/09/2023 02:21 PM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Barry Michael Ward for Appellant Mr. George Poulos.. Certificate of Service: 01/09/2023. [22-4070] (BMW) [Entered: 01/09/2023 02:20 PM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. George Poulos by Barry M. Ward. Certificate of Service: 01/09/2023. [22-4070] (BMW) [Entered: 01/09/2023 02:19 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 12/28/2022 11:11 AM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/06/2023; appellee brief due 03/08/2023. (REO) [Entered: 12/27/2022 03:37 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 12/27/2022 03:36 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. George Poulos. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 12/27/2022 03:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: George Poulos v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE POULOS, as Administrator, W.W.A. of The Estate of Harold Lewis Parker, Deceased
Represented By: Barry Michael Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Ruchi Asher
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?