Jennifer Jenkins v. Obion County, TN Sheriff's Department, et al
Defendant: OBION COUNTY, TN SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, et al.
Plaintiff / Appellee: JENNIFER LOUISE JENKINS, Administrator ad Litem of the Estate of Sterling L. Higgins
Defendant / Appellant: MARY BROGGLIN, WAYLON SPAULDING and BRENDON SANFORD
Case Number: 22-6029
Filed: November 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - mediation [ # 8 ] filed by Mr. Nathan D. Tilly.. Entered by order of the court. (CAW) [Entered: 12/16/2022 08:05 AM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Nathan D. Tilly for Appellants Mary Brogglin, Brendon Sanford and Waylon Spaulding. Certificate of Service: 12/15/2022. [22-6029] (NDT) [Entered: 12/15/2022 01:31 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jennifer Louise Jenkins by David Cooper. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2022. [22-6029] (DLC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 06:09 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Mary Brogglin, Brendon Sanford and Waylon Spaulding by Nathan D. Tilly. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2022. [22-6029] (NDT) [Entered: 12/06/2022 04:05 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 is hereby canceled. (MLB) [Entered: 12/06/2022 03:50 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a stipulation to dismiss is due 01/05/2023. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (MLB) [Entered: 12/06/2022 03:31 PM]
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/28/2022 01:20 PM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 11/23/2022 01:02 PM]
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Mary Brogglin, Brendon Sanford and Waylon Spaulding. Transcript needed: y. (RLB) [Entered: 11/23/2022 01:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jennifer Jenkins v. Obion County, TN Sheriff's Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER LOUISE JENKINS, Administrator ad Litem of the Estate of Sterling L. Higgins
Represented By: David L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBION COUNTY, TN SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARY BROGGLIN
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WAYLON SPAULDING
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRENDON SANFORD
Represented By: Nathan D. Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?