Kareem Tucker v. Douglas Fender
Petitioner / Appellant: KAREEM L. TUCKER
Respondent / Appellee: DOUGLAS FENDER, Warden
Case Number: 23-3122
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 4 ]; previously filed by Mr. Kareem L. Tucker. Response from Attorney Ms. Maura O'Neill Jaite for Appellee Douglas Fender. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2023. [23-3122] (MOJ) [Entered: 03/16/2023 10:51 AM]
March 8, 2023 Filing 6 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (VLP) [Entered: 03/08/2023 12:40 PM]
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Kareem L. Tucker Certificate of Service: 02/20/2023. (VLP) [Entered: 03/08/2023 12:39 PM]
March 8, 2023 Filing 4 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Kareem L. Tucker to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 02/20/2023. (VLP) [Entered: 03/08/2023 12:39 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas Fender by Maura O'Neill Jaite. Certificate of Service: 02/10/2023. [23-3122] (MOJ) [Entered: 02/10/2023 01:03 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 02/09/2023 12:15 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Kareem L. Tucker. Transcript needed: n. (VLP) [Entered: 02/09/2023 12:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kareem Tucker v. Douglas Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KAREEM L. TUCKER
Represented By: Kareem L. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DOUGLAS FENDER, Warden
Represented By: Maura O'Neill Jaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?